This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2020 at 07:15:00 (UTC).

Eastman v. United States Fire Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 Eastman filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United States Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joe Heaton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00546

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joe Heaton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chad Eastman

Defendants

Progressive Company The

Crum & Forster Insurance Group

United States Fire Insurance Company

Crum & Forster Indemnity Company

Redwood Group Inc The

Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited

Marketers General Ins Agency Inc

Progressive Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark A Shores

Attorney at Mark Shores PLLC

P O Box 2955

Oklahoma City, OK 73101

Timothy B Hummel

500 W Main St, Suite 204

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

John C Lennon

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green-OKC

P O Box 26350, 1109 N Francis Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73126-0350

Peter L Wheeler

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green-OKC

P O Box 26350, 1109 N Francis Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73126-0350

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Petition

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Policy

1 #3

Exhibit 3- Docket Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4- Amended Petition

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Progressive Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Hummel, Timothy) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy B Hummel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hummel, Timothy) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at #http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by United States Fire Insurance Company . (Lennon, John) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United States Fire Insurance Company.(Lennon, John) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by John C Lennon on behalf of United States Fire Insurance Company (Lennon, John) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Peter L Wheeler on behalf of United States Fire Insurance Company (Wheeler, Peter) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3171912. (Lennon, John) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-2247 filed by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- Policy, #3 Exhibit 3- Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4- Amended Petition, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Redwood Group Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers is a litigant

Latest cases where CRUM & FORSTER INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Insurance Company is a litigant