This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2019 at 07:45:13 (UTC).

East v. Dooley et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 East filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Dooley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberto A. Lange. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04126

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roberto A. Lange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald East

Springfield, SD 57062

Defendants

LPN Brittany Huber

CO Mastalir

Warden Robert Dooley

PA Brad Adams

CPL. Barta

PA Karissa Zimmer

RN Dayna Klawitter

Jane Does 1 and 2 and 3

Warden Brent Fluke

Other Unknown Persons and Entities

CPL. Ahrens

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Letter re Legal Mail and access to the courts and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donald East. (JLS) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Brad Adams, Ahrens, Barta, Robert Dooley, Brent Fluke, Brittany Huber, Dayna Klawitter, Mastalir, Karissa Zimmer. 9 Summmons(es), order granting issuance of summons, and complaint delivered to USM via electronic delivery. (SRA) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald East. (SRA) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#8

(#8) Service LETTER with enclosed #7 Order, AO85, Rule 73 Memo, Sample Summons & USM285, Blank Summons and Blank USM285 forms sent by Clerk's Office to Donald East. (JLS) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Screening Case, denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 8/26/19. (JLS) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald East. (JLS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donald East. (JLS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Approval to Exceed Page/Word Limitation for Briefs by Donald East. (JLS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

1 #1

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand ($350.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400050424) filed by Donald East. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (JLS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Letter re Legal Mail and access to the courts and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donald East. (JLS) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Brad Adams, Ahrens, Barta, Robert Dooley, Brent Fluke, Brittany Huber, Dayna Klawitter, Mastalir, Karissa Zimmer. 9 Summmons(es), order granting issuance of summons, and complaint delivered to USM via electronic delivery. (SRA) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald East. (SRA) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Service LETTER with enclosed #7 Order, AO85, Rule 73 Memo, Sample Summons & USM285, Blank Summons and Blank USM285 forms sent by Clerk's Office to Donald East. (JLS) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Screening Case, denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 8/26/19. (JLS) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with a Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Motion for Approval to Exceed Page/Word Limitation for Briefs, Filing fee of $350, an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury and Prisoner Trust Account Report. A new case has been opened. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (JLS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRISONER Trust Account Report. (JLS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald East. (JLS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donald East. (JLS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Approval to Exceed Page/Word Limitation for Briefs by Donald East. (JLS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand ($350.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400050424) filed by Donald East. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (JLS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less