This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:10:23 (UTC).

EAST COAST SPINE JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE v. BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 EAST COAST SPINE JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McNulty and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00165

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAST COAST SPINE JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE

Defendants

BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS

JOHN DOES 1-10

JANE DOES 1-10

ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARA LAWALL

Attorney at LAWALL & MITCHELL, LLC

55 Madison Avenue, 4Th Floor

Morristown, NJ 07960

Defendant Attorneys

SARANNE ELIZABETH WEIMER

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

506 Carnegie Center, Suite 300

Princeton, NJ 08540

DAVID G. MURPHY

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

506 Carnegie Center, Suite 300

Princeton, NJ 08540

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CONSENT ORDER vacating clerk's entry of default as to BCBSIL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/9/2023. (lag, ) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#7

(#7) Proposed Order to Vacate Default and Amend Pleadings by BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS. (MURPHY, DAVID) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by DARA LAWALL on behalf of EAST COAST SPINE JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE (LAWALL, DARA) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

4 #5

Text of Proposed Order

4 #4

Certificate of Service

4 #3

Certification

4 #2

Certification

4 #1

Brief

#4

(#4) MOTION to Vacate Notice of Motion by BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Certification, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(WEIMER, SARANNE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Vacate Notice of Motion to Vacate by BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS. (WEIMER, SARANNE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by SARANNE ELIZABETH WEIMER on behalf of BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS (WEIMER, SARANNE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Certification of David G. Murphy, Esq.

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS from Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County, case number L-002136-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13955041), filed by BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Certification of David G. Murphy, Esq., #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Certificate of Service)(MURPHY, DAVID) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT ORDER vacating clerk's entry of default as to BCBSIL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/9/2023. (lag, ) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Order to Vacate Default and Amend Pleadings by BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS. (MURPHY, DAVID) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by DARA LAWALL on behalf of EAST COAST SPINE JOINT AND SPORTS MEDICINE (LAWALL, DARA) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 2/10/2023. (LM, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER terminating #4 Motion to Vacate - The Court having held a telephonic conference with counsel on this date and having expressed that it prefers to adjudicate the Motion to Vacate Default before addressing the issues presented in the Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), the motion at ECF No. 4 is hereby terminated without prejudice to refiling solely as a Motion to Vacate Default if efforts between counsel to arrange vacatur consensually are unsuccessful. Until the issue of vacatur is resolved, defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended without date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/10/2023. (rn) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Vacate Notice of Motion. Motion set for 3/6/2023 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, ) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE -Please be advised that the motions D.E. #3 and D.E. #4 appear to be duplicates. Motion in D.E. #3 will be terminated. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (lag, ) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Vacate Notice of Motion by BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Certification, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(WEIMER, SARANNE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Vacate Notice of Motion to Vacate by BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS. (WEIMER, SARANNE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by SARANNE ELIZABETH WEIMER on behalf of BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS (WEIMER, SARANNE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS from Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County, case number L-002136-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13955041), filed by BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Certification of David G. Murphy, Esq., #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Certificate of Service)(MURPHY, DAVID) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less