Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2021 at 07:14:27 (UTC).

East Coast Entertainment of Durham, LLC v. Houston Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 East Coast Entertainment of Durham, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Houston Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan B. Gottschall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06551

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan B. Gottschall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

East Coast Entertainment of Durham, LLC

Defendants

Houston Casualty Company

American Claims Management Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan D. King

Attorney at Brown, Udell, Pomerantz & Delrahim, Ltd.

225 W. Illinois Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Michael S. Pomerantz

Attorney at Brown, Udell & Pomerantz, Ltd.

225 W. Illinois Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Edward Feinberg

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

One N. Franklin, Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) REPLY by Defendants American Claims Management Inc., Houston Casualty Company to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 , memorandum in support of motion #12 Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Feinberg, Daniel) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

17 #16

Exhibit P

17 #15

Exhibit O

17 #14

Exhibit N

17 #13

Exhibit M

17 #12

Exhibit L

17 #11

Exhibit K

17 #8

Exhibit H

17 #7

Exhibit G

17 #6

Exhibit F

17 #5

Exhibit E

17 #4

Exhibit D

17 #3

Exhibit C

17 #2

Exhibit B

17 #1

Exhibit A

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM by American Claims Management Inc., Houston Casualty Company in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feinberg, Daniel) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants American Claims Management Inc., Houston Casualty Company (Feinberg, Daniel) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY by Defendants American Claims Management Inc., Houston Casualty Company to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 , memorandum in support of motion #12 Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Feinberg, Daniel) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS by East Coast Entertainment of Durham, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(King, Bryan) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by East Coast Entertainment of Durham, LLC re other #15 (King, Bryan) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS by East Coast Entertainment of Durham, LLC (King, Bryan) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUPPLEMENT to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 , memorandum in support of motion #12 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Feinberg, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendants' motion (No. #11 ) to dismiss the complaint for failure to state a claim is briefed as follows: response due: 12/3/2020; reply due: 12/17/2020. The deadline of 12/9/2020 (No. #7 ) to file an initial status report is stricken. The court will rule by mail on the motion to dismiss and set a further deadline, if necessary, after ruling.Mailed notice (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM by American Claims Management Inc., Houston Casualty Company in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feinberg, Daniel) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants American Claims Management Inc., Houston Casualty Company (Feinberg, Daniel) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiffs' Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by East Coast Entertainment of Durham, LLC (King, Bryan) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff East Coast Entertainment of Durham, LLC by Michael S. Pomerantz (Pomerantz, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff East Coast Entertainment of Durham, LLC by Bryan D. King (King, Bryan) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before December 9, 2020. The parties are directed to consult Judge Gottschall's website for specific requirements for all written status reports and for the discovery plans. In conformity with the Seventh Amended General Order 20-12 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all plaintiffs have been served. If all plaintiffs have not been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 11/5/2020. Mailed notice(mjc, ) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, ) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by American Claims Management Inc., Houston Casualty Company Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feinberg, Daniel) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by American Claims Management Inc., Houston Casualty Company (Feinberg, Daniel) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Claims Management Inc., Houston Casualty Company by Daniel Edward Feinberg (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Feinberg, Daniel) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Feinberg, Daniel) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020CH6067) filed by American Claims Management Inc., Houston Casualty Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17609349. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Feinberg, Daniel) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN CLAIMS MANAGEMENT INC. FOR EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Houston Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan D. King