This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2020 at 07:48:15 (UTC).

EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/12/2020 EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-14299

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ

Defendant

UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL GOTTLIEB

Attorney at SCHWARTZ SLADKUS REICH GREENBERG ATLAS LLP

444 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorney

FRANCIS X. MANNING

Attorney at STRADLEY, RONON, STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 100

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on January 25, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/9/2020. (as, ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. (MANNING, FRANCIS) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MANNING, FRANCIS) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Letter Request to extend Defendant's answer deadline up to and including December 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/16/20. (jc, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Letter from Plaintiff. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11488009), filed by EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on January 25, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/9/2020. (as, ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. (MANNING, FRANCIS) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MANNING, FRANCIS) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Update - #5 Plaintiff's Letter Request to extend Defendant UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY's answer deadline has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/9/2020. (jc, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Letter Request to extend Defendant's answer deadline up to and including December 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/16/20. (jc, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Plaintiff. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER : Our records indicate that proof of service has been filed in this civil action and that the time for defendant to answer has expired. You are hereby directed to move this civil action by requesting that a default and default judgment be entered or submitting an extension to Answer out of time within ten (10) days from the date hereof. Should you fail to do so, this action shall be listed for dismissal on November 25, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. So Ordered ed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/13/2020. (lr, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketJudge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps, ) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11488009), filed by EAST COAST AESTHETIC SURGERY NJ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less