This case was last updated from PACER on 10/25/2020 at 09:47:52 (UTC).

Easom v. US Well Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 Easom filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against US Well Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02995

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scott Easom

John Nau

Adrian Howard

Defendant

US Well Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gabriel Amin Assaad

Attorney at McDonald Worley

1770 St. James Place, Suite 100

Houston, TX 77056

Kennedy Law Firm LLP

Attorney at Kennedy Law Firm, LLP

2925 Richmond Ave., Suite 1200

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorney

David Matthew Korn

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

365 Canal St, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 11/24/2020 at 11:45 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. A Zoom link will be emailed for participation. (leddins, 4) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) First MOTION for Extension of Time Respond or Answer First Amended Class Action Complaint by US Well Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Korn, David) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#14

(#14) PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling & Docket Control, filed.(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#13

(#13) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Scott Easom, filed.(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by US Well Services, Inc., filed.(Korn, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Scott Easom, filed.(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Scott Easom.(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint ; Answer due for US Well Services, Inc. 10/20/2020. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by US Well Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer)(Korn, David) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Galvin Kennedy on behalf of Scott Easom, filed. (Kennedy, Galvin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to US Well Services, Inc. served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020, filed.(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to US Well Services, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

3 #1

Attachments

#3

(#3) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 11/24/2020 at 11:45 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. A Zoom link will be emailed for participation. (leddins, 4) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First MOTION for Extension of Time Respond or Answer First Amended Class Action Complaint by US Well Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Korn, David) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling & Docket Control, filed.(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Scott Easom, filed.(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by US Well Services, Inc., filed.(Korn, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Scott Easom, filed.(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Scott Easom.(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint ; Answer due for US Well Services, Inc. 10/20/2020. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by US Well Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer)(Korn, David) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Galvin Kennedy on behalf of Scott Easom, filed. (Kennedy, Galvin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to US Well Services, Inc. served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020, filed.(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to US Well Services, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25118977) filed by Scott Easom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Assaad, Gabriel) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S WELL SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M Korn