This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2021 at 11:03:33 (UTC).

EASLEY v. WETZEL et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 EASLEY filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against WETZEL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Lanzillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00251

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Lanzillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WARREN EASLEY

Collegeville, PA 19426

Defendants

JOHN WETZEL

OBERLANDER

SARATELLA

ADAMS

BLICHA

MONGELLUZZO

GILL

LT JOHN DOE

BEATTY

FAJBIK

FERGUSON

WRIGHT

COL. CALTAGARONE

KATHLEEN HILL

SMITH

BONNIE BELL

BROWN

LT GATTO

LT LARSON

21 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion

1 #2

Envelope

#2

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER Plaintiff shall provide the Court with one complete copy of his 41-page Complaint for service upon each of the 41 named Defendants listed in the Complaint on or before December 6, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/4/2021. (dm) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Plaintiff shall provide the Court with one complete copy of his 41-page Complaint for service upon each of the 41 named Defendants listed in the Complaint on or before December 6, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/4/2021. (dm) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by WARREN EASLEY. (jjg) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by WARREN EASLEY. (jjg) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WARREN EASLEY. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Envelope) (jjg) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEATTY is a litigant

Latest cases where OBERLANDER is a litigant

Latest cases where GILL is a litigant

Latest cases where Adams is a litigant