Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 11:19:56 (UTC).

Easley et al v. Republic Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Easley filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Republic Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00483

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jess Easley, II

Jessica Easley

Defendant

Republic Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert C. Funderburk, Jr.

Attorney at Funderburk & Butler

1111 S. Foster Drive Suite G

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

David Thomas Butler, Jr.

Attorney at Funderburk & Butler

1111 S. Foster Drive Suite G

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Kerrigan Dennard

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

400 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Dakota Kyle Chenevert

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

400 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs and by Republic Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. (Dennard, Mary) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Republic Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. (Dennard, Mary) Modified on 9/16/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE). (Entered: 09/15/2020)

4 #3

Exhibit

4 #2

Memorandum in Support

4 #1

Proposed Pleading; order

#4

(#4) First MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit)(Funderburk, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#3

(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 9/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/20/2020. (EDC) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Republic Fire And Casualty Insurance Company.(Dennard, Mary) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court record

1 #2

Exhibit B - Service return citation

1 #1

Exhibit A - Petition for Damages

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial District Court, Case Number 46267. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2147864), filed by Republic Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Service return citation, #3 Exhibit C - State Court record, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dennard, Mary) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/29/2020 to flatten the pages) (SWE). (Entered: 07/28/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs and by Republic Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. (Dennard, Mary) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Republic Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. (Dennard, Mary) Modified on 9/16/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE). (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2020 is RESET to 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY. All other deadlines remain unchanged. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.). (SGO) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 First MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit)(Funderburk, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 9/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/20/2020. (EDC) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Republic Fire And Casualty Insurance Company.(Dennard, Mary) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial District Court, Case Number 46267. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2147864), filed by Republic Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Service return citation, #3 Exhibit C - State Court record, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dennard, Mary) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/29/2020 to flatten the pages) (SWE). (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Republic Fire and Casualty Ins. Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Kerrigan Dennard