Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2020 at 07:02:13 (UTC).

Earth Island Institute v. Crystal Geyser Water Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 Earth Island Institute filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Crystal Geyser Water Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02212

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Earth Island Institute

Defendants

Nestle USA, Inc.

PepsiCo, Inc.

Danone North America

Crystal Geyser Water Company

Colgate-Palmolive Company

The Procter & Gamble Company

Mars, Incorporated

The Coca-Cola Company

The Clorox Company

Mondelez International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tyson Carl Redenbarger

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Tamarah P. Prevost

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre McCarthy

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Noorjahan Rahman

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Eric James Buescher

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Defendant Attorneys

Perlette Michele Jura

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn Crutcher LLP

333 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 5300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Bradley Joseph Hamburger

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Andrew Santo Tulumello

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Allexanderia V. Bingham

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-4297

Angela Christine Agrusa

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

2000 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 400 North Tower

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4704

Richard Blair Goetz

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

400 South Hope Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

Dawn Sestito

Attorney at OMelveny and Myers LLP

400 S Hope St 15Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

Steven A. Zalesin

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb and Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-6710

Brandon Trice

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb and Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Robert Mont Howard

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

12670 High Bluff Drive

San Diego, CA 92130

Margaret Tough

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Shannon Danielle Lankenau

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mary Rose Alexander

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

330 N. Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Mark Craig Goodman

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

2 Embarcadero Center, 11H Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Anne Kelts Assayag

Attorney at Baker McKenzie

Two Embarcadero Center, 11Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#74

(#74) ORDER (as modified) by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #72 Stipulation REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE'S #69 MOTION TO REMAND. Responses due by 6/8/2020; Replies due by 7/1/2020 and Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (Disregard Docket No. #73 ). Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/29/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#73

(#73) DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. #74 . ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #72 Stipulation REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE'S MOTION TO REMAND. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (ndrS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#72

(#72) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE'S MOTION TO REMAND re #69 Motion to Remand, filed by PepsiCo, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Crystal Geyser Water Company, Danone North America, Earth Island Institute, Mars, Incorporated, Mondelez International, Inc., Nestle USA, Inc., The Clorox Company, The Coca-Cola Company, The Proctor & Gamble Company. (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 5/28/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#71

(#71) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Metcalf, Jane. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#70

(#70) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jane Metcalf ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14479248.) filed by The Coca-Cola Company. (Metcalf, Jane) (Filed on 5/18/2020) Modified on 5/19/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2020)

69 #1

Proposed Order

#69

(#69) MOTION to Remand filed by Earth Island Institute. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/15/2020. Replies due by 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/1/2020) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#68

(#68) NOTICE of Appearance of Eric James Buescher as Counsel, filed by Earth Island Institute (Buescher, Eric) (Filed on 5/1/2020) Modified on 5/4/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#66

(#66) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff Earth Island Institute's Motion to Remand, filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company, Crystal Geyser Water Company, Danone North America, Earth Island Institute, Mars, Incorporated, Mondelez International, Inc., Nestle USA, Inc., PepsiCo, Inc., The Clorox Company, The Coca-Cola Company, The Procter & Gamble Company (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/30/2020)

2 #13

Exhibit L

2 #12

Exhibit K

2 #7

Exhibit F

2 #5

Exhibit D

2 #4

Exhibit C

2 #3

Exhibit B

2 #2

Exhibit A

2 #1

Declaration of C. Chapla

#1

(#1) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PepsiCo, Inc. (and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons) (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) ORDER (as modified) by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #72 Stipulation REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE'S #69 MOTION TO REMAND. Responses due by 6/8/2020; Replies due by 7/1/2020 and Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (Disregard Docket No. #73 ). Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/29/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. #74 . ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #72 Stipulation REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE'S MOTION TO REMAND. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (ndrS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE'S MOTION TO REMAND re #69 Motion to Remand, filed by PepsiCo, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Crystal Geyser Water Company, Danone North America, Earth Island Institute, Mars, Incorporated, Mondelez International, Inc., Nestle USA, Inc., The Clorox Company, The Coca-Cola Company, The Proctor & Gamble Company. (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 5/28/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Metcalf, Jane. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jane Metcalf ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14479248.) filed by The Coca-Cola Company. (Metcalf, Jane) (Filed on 5/18/2020) Modified on 5/19/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) MOTION to Remand filed by Earth Island Institute. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/15/2020. Replies due by 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/1/2020) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE of Appearance of Eric James Buescher as Counsel, filed by Earth Island Institute (Buescher, Eric) (Filed on 5/1/2020) Modified on 5/4/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #66 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff Earth Island Institute's Motion to Remand. Motions due by 5/1/2020; Responses due by 6/1/2020 and Replies due by 6/22/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff Earth Island Institute's Motion to Remand, filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company, Crystal Geyser Water Company, Danone North America, Earth Island Institute, Mars, Incorporated, Mondelez International, Inc., Nestle USA, Inc., PepsiCo, Inc., The Clorox Company, The Coca-Cola Company, The Procter & Gamble Company (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE of Appearance of Allexanderia V. Bingham as Counsel, filed by Danone North America (Bingham, Allexanderia) (Filed on 4/17/2020) Modified on 4/20/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Interested Entities by The Clorox Company (Alexander, Mary) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Clorox Company (Alexander, Mary) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Danielle Lankenau on behalf of The Clorox Company (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Mont Howard on behalf of The Clorox Company (Howard, Robert) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Tough on behalf of The Clorox Company (Tough, Margaret) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Rose Alexander on behalf of The Clorox Company (Alexander, Mary) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by PepsiCo, Inc. re #2 Notice of Removal,, Filing Notice of Removal of Action With State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/15/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14333093) from Superior Court of California, Cty of San Mateo. Their case number is 20-CIV-01213. (). Filed byPepsiCo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Chapla, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PepsiCo, Inc. (and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons) (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CLOROX COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Danone North America is a litigant