This case was last updated from PACER on 07/25/2020 at 18:42:28 (UTC).

Earley v. Ecolab Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Earley filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ecolab Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Cowan Wright and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01246

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Denise Earley

Defendants

Ecolab Inc.

Does 1-100 Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob Robert Rusch

Attorney at Johnson Becker PLLC

444 Cedar Street, Suite 1800

St. Paul, MN 55101

Timothy J Becker

Attorney at Johnson Becker PLLC

444 Cedar St, Ste 1800

St. Paul, MN 55101

Richard Dale McCune, Jr

Attorney at Mccune Wright Arevalo LLP

18565 Jamboree Road, Ste 550

Irvine, CA 92612

Michele M Vercoski

Attorney at Mccune Wright Arevalo, LLP

18565 Jamboree Road, Ste 550

Irvine, CA 91761

Tuan Q. Nguyen

Attorney at Mccune Wright Arevalo, LLP

18565 Jamboree Road, Ste 550

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant Attorney

Richard G Morgan

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois

90 South 7Th Street, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Ecolab Inc.. (Morgan, Richard) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

10 #1

Certificate of Service

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ecolab Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Morgan, Richard) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Tuan Q. Nguyen on behalf of Denise Earley. (Nguyen, Tuan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Dale McCune, Jr on behalf of Denise Earley. (McCune, Richard) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Denise Earley. Ecolab Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Vercoski, Michele) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michele M Vercoski on behalf of Denise Earley. (Vercoski, Michele) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#8

(#9) PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 - ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/16/2020.(kt) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Does, Ecolab Inc. (MTP) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Does 1-100 inclusive, Ecolab, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7749286) filed by Denise Earley. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Becker, Timothy) Modified text on 5/26/2020 (MTP). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Ecolab Inc.. (Morgan, Richard) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ecolab Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Morgan, Richard) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 - ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/16/2020.(kt) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Tuan Q. Nguyen on behalf of Denise Earley. (Nguyen, Tuan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Dale McCune, Jr on behalf of Denise Earley. (McCune, Richard) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Denise Earley. Ecolab Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Vercoski, Michele) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michele M Vercoski on behalf of Denise Earley. (Vercoski, Michele) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION re 4 Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney: This entry has been marked "Filed in Error" as the pro hac vice fees have been waived for McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP lawyers associated with all properly identified OxyCide cases per Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright's Order issued on 05/21/2020. Michele M. Vercoski, Richard D. McCune, and Tuan Q. Nguyen only need to file a Notice of Appearance.(MTP) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket(#4) FILED IN ERROR. (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michele M. Vercoski, Richard D. McCune, Tuan Q. Nguyen as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MTP) Modified text on 5/26/2020 (MTP). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Does, Ecolab Inc. (MTP) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-01246 SRN/ECW. (MTP) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Does 1-100 inclusive, Ecolab, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7749286) filed by Denise Earley. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Becker, Timothy) Modified text on 5/26/2020 (MTP). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less