This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2020 at 08:37:44 (UTC).

EARL v. NVR, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 EARL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NVR, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Arthur J. Schwab. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00505

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arthur J. Schwab

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LISA EARL

Defendants

NVR, INC., T/D/B/A HEARTLAND HOMES OF PA

NVR, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher J. Azzara

Attorney at Strassburger, McKenna, Gutnick & Gefsky

Four Gateway Center, Suite 2200, 444 Liberty Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Jordan L. Strassburger

Attorney at Strassburger McKenna Gutnick & Gefsky

Four Gateway Center, Suite 2200, 444 Liberty Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Robyn B. Eisen

Attorney at Strassburger McKenna Gutnick & Gefsky

444 Liberty Avenue, Suite 2200, Four Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Adam J. Tragone

Attorney at Strassburger McKenna Gutnick & Gefsky

444 Liberty Avenue, Four Gateway Center, Suite 2200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant Attorneys

Kathleen A. Gallagher

Attorney at Porter Wright Morris & Arthur LLP

6 Ppg Place, Third Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Russell D. Giancola

Attorney at Porter Wright Morris & Arthur LLP

6 Ppg Place, Third Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#27

RESTRICTED

#26

(#26) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #25 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by LISA EARL. Filing fee $505, receipt number APAWDC-5651102. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Strassburger, Jordan) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#25

(#25) MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #14 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/29/20. (bfm) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#24

(#24) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by NVR, INC.. (Giancola, Russell) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#23

(#23) Proposed Case Management Order by NVR, INC.. (Giancola, Russell) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#22

(#22) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Giancola, Russell) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#21

(#21) REPLY BRIEF re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NVR, INC.. (Gallagher, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#20) BRIEF in Opposition re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LISA EARL. (Strassburger, Jordan) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell D. Giancola on behalf of NVR, INC., T/D/B/A HEARTLAND HOMES OF PA. (Giancola, Russell) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NVR, INC., T/D/B/A HEARTLAND HOMES OF PA. (Gallagher, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from COMMON PLEAS OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number GD-19-004040 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5551827), filed by NVR INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) Modified text on 4/9/2020. (Entered: 04/09/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) USCA Case Number 20-2109 for #26 Notice of Appeal, filed by LISA EARL. USCA Case Manager Tim McIntyre (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (tmm3) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #25 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by LISA EARL. Filing fee $505, receipt number APAWDC-5651102. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Strassburger, Jordan) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #14 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/29/20. (bfm) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by NVR, INC.. (Giancola, Russell) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Proposed Case Management Order by NVR, INC.. (Giancola, Russell) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Giancola, Russell) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY BRIEF re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NVR, INC.. (Gallagher, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BRIEF in Opposition re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LISA EARL. (Strassburger, Jordan) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Docket(#19) TEXT ORDER - Revised deadline for filing of 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation - - fully completed documents are now due to be filed on or before 5/25/20. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 05/20/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (ms) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docket(#18) TEXT ORDER - The TIME of the Initial Case Management Conference via Zoom is RESCHEDULED for 6/3/2020 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/19/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 04/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER approving #8 Stipulation filed by NVR, INC., T/D/B/A HEARTLAND HOMES OF PA. Defendant shall file its response to the original Complaint by May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/16/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by NVR, INC., T/D/B/A HEARTLAND HOMES OF PA. (Giancola, Russell) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Tragone on behalf of LISA EARL. (Tragone, Adam) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn B. Eisen on behalf of LISA EARL. (Eisen, Robyn) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/10/20. (ms) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell D. Giancola on behalf of NVR, INC., T/D/B/A HEARTLAND HOMES OF PA. (Giancola, Russell) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NVR, INC., T/D/B/A HEARTLAND HOMES OF PA. (Gallagher, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from COMMON PLEAS OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number GD-19-004040 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5551827), filed by NVR INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) Modified text on 4/9/2020. (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NVR Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam J. Tragone

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan L. Strassburger Esq.