This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:32:34 (UTC).

Earin v. Bannister et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Earin filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bannister. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02097

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Earin

Indian Springs, NV 89070

Defendants

H Landsman

T Augustine

James Dzurenda

Dr Robert Bannister

Taino

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Paul Earin (JM) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paul Earin. (JM) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Payment of filing fees or IFP due 2/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/11/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: IFP to P - JM) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paul Earin. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(JM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Paul Earin (JM) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paul Earin. (JM) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Payment of filing fees or IFP due 2/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/11/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: IFP to P - JM) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paul Earin. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(JM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less