This case was last updated from PACER on 08/22/2021 at 07:59:18 (UTC).

Eagle Lake Farms Partnership v. Bayer Cropscience LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Eagle Lake Farms Partnership filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bayer Cropscience LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00743

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eagle Lake Farms Partnership

Defendants

Corteva, Inc.

Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.

Cargill Incorporated

BASF Corporation

Tenkoz Inc.

CHS Inc.

Growmark Inc.

Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.

Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.

Univar Solutions, Inc.

Winfield Solutions, LLC

Bayer CropScience L.P.

Bayer CropScience Inc

Syngenta Corporation

Growmark FS, LLC

Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel E. Gustafson

Attorney at GUSTAFSON GLUEK PLLC

120 South 6Th St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jeffrey B Gittleman

Attorney at Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

2001 Market St Ste 3300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Daniel J Nordin

Attorney at GUSTAFSON GLUEK PLLC

120 South 6Th St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Mickey L Stevens

Attorney at GUSTAFSON GLUEK PLLC

120 South 6Th St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin W. Hulse

Attorney at BLACKWELL BURKE PA

431 S. Seventh Street, Suite 2500

Minneapolis, MN 55415

X. Kevin Zhao

Attorney at GREENE ESPEL PLLP

222 South Ninth Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Lara Bach

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL LLP - Miami

1395 Brickell Ave., Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33131

Mary Fee

Attorney at FREDRIKSON AND BYRON PA

200 S. Sixth Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1425

Todd A Wind

Attorney at FREDRIKSON AND BYRON PA

200 S. Sixth Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1425

Brandon J. Wheeler

Attorney at FELHABER LARSON PA

220 South 6Th Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4504

David L Hashmall

Attorney at FELHABER LARSON PA

220 South 6Th Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4504

Kathy Osborn

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

300 N. Meridian St., Ste. 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

F Matthew Ralph

Attorney at DORSEY AND WHITNEY Minneapolis

50 S. Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

Michael A Lindsay

Attorney at DORSEY AND WHITNEY Minneapolis

50 S. Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

Jaime Stilson

Attorney at DORSEY AND WHITNEY LLP - Minneapolis

50 S. Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

Jon M. Woodruff

Attorney at STINSON LLP - Minneapolis

50 S. 6Th St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jonathan C Miesen

Attorney at Land O'Lakes, Inc.

4001 Lexington Ave N

Arden Hills, MN 55126

Richard G Jensen

Attorney at FABYANSKE AND WESTRA PA

333 South Seventh Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jevon Bindman

Attorney at MASLON LLP

90 S. Seventh Street, 3300 Wells Fargo Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

James J. Long

Attorney at BRIGGS AND MORGAN

332 Minnesota Street, 2200 First National Bank Building

St. Paul, MN 55101

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#67

No Description Available

66 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#64

No Description Available

#62

(#75) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #62 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathy Osborn for CHS Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#60

No Description Available

#53

No Description Available

#48

No Description Available

#42

No Description Available

#41

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

22 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

#22

No Description Available

21 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#18

No Description Available

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Tenkoz, Inc. (CLK) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #82 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary Fee ;attorney/firm Mary Fee by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary) filed by BASF Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Mary Fee terminated. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/20/21. (ARL) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary Fee ;attorney/firm Mary Fee by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DJO) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00543. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DJO) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk.(MMP) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket(#79) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jason A. Leckerman as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KNK) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) TEXT-ONLY ORDER in Response to #77 Letter to Magistrate Judge. With the permission of presiding District Judge Michael J. Davis, and in response to #77 the parties' letter reflecting their agreement and intention that Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. was to be added as a defendant in this matter with the filing of the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, the Clerk of Court is directed to add Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. as a defendant in this matter. This matter remains stayed pursuant to #71 the May 5, 2021 Order of Judge Davis staying all proceedings and deadlines, including but not limited to the filing of additional motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/26/2021. (EB) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Eagle Lake Farms Partnership . (Nordin, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #72 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lara Bach for BASF Corporation.; granting #73 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David J. Lender for BASF Corporation.; granting #74 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adam C. Hemlock for BASF Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #62 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathy Osborn for CHS Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc.. (Stilson, Jaime) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-543 (MJD/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/26/2021.(MMP) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey B Gittleman for Eagle Lake Farms Partnership; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Chad Carder for Eagle Lake Farms Partnership. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/1/2021. (NAH) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chad A. Carder. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8542073 filed by Eagle Lake Farms Partnership. (Looby, Michelle) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey B. Gittleman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8542022 filed by Eagle Lake Farms Partnership. (Looby, Michelle) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jeffrey B. Gittleman, Chad A. Carder, John G. Emerson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Tenkoz, Inc. (CLK) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Syngenta Corporation, Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (CLK) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-543 PJS/DTS. (CLK) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8532990) filed by Eagle Lake Farms Partnership. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. is a litigant