Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2021 at 07:38:45 (UTC).

Eads v. Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Eads filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert S. Ballou and Thomas T. Cullen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00329

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert S. Ballou

Presiding Judge

Thomas T. Cullen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerry Junior Eads

Meadowview, VA 24361

Defendants

Captain Tatum

The Medical Staff

Major Kilgore

Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority

Lt. Mullins

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account n(Trust Account Statements); Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days. Responses due by 6/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 5/25/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Kilgore, Mullins, Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority, Captain Tatum, The Medical Staff, filed by Jerry Junior Eads.(slt) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account n(Trust Account Statements); Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days. Responses due by 6/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 5/25/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Jerry Junior Eads (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(slt) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Kilgore, Mullins, Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority, Captain Tatum, The Medical Staff, filed by Jerry Junior Eads.(slt) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL STAFF is a litigant