This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/13/2020 at 10:43:22 (UTC).

EADS, LLC et al v. The Harford Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 EADS, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claude M. Hilton and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00928

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claude M. Hilton

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EADS, LLC

Minnesota Group, LLC

Defendant

The Harford Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Caitlin Marie Brown

C. Thomas Brown

Erik Broch Lawson

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Etta Pak

George Edwin Reede, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

10 #3

Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

3 #6

Proposed Order Proposed Order Motion to Dismiss

3 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D Moreau Letter 11-7-19

3 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C Moreau Letter 10-29-18

3 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B Moreau Affidavit

3 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A Policy

3 #1

Supplement Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#3

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions terminated: #3 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company.. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/9/2020. (shea) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) So Ordered re #11 MOTION to Withdraw #3 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/9/2020. (shea) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketPer CMH Chambers motion set for 9/11/20 withdrawn. (klau, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Withdraw #3 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. (Reede, George) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Reede, George) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Broch Lawson on behalf of EADS, LLC, Minnesota Group, LLC (Lawson, Erik) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by EADS, LLC, Minnesota Group, LLC of Disclosure of Membership Interests (Brown, C.) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Minnesota Group, LLC. (Brown, C.) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by EADS, LLC. (Brown, C.) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Memorandum in Opposition re #3 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by EADS, LLC, Minnesota Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit C. Thomas Brown, Esquire, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Brown, C.) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #3 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Hearing Date set for 9/11/2020 re #3 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Reede, George) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #3 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (shea) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) [WITHDRAWN] First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Policy, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Moreau Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C Moreau Letter 10-29-18, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D Moreau Letter 11-7-19, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order Motion to Dismiss)(Reede, George) Modified on 9/9/2020 (shea, ). (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (aott, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. (Pak, Jessica) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7353870.), filed by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Pak, Jessica) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less