This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2020 at 07:07:39 (UTC).

E-Link Technology Co. Ltd. v. Shenzhen Chitado Technology Co. Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 E-Link Technology Co Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Shenzhen Chitado Technology Co Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Johnson Coleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08468

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E-Link Technology Co. Ltd.

Defendants

Amazon Defendant 1

Shenzhen Chitado Technology Co. Ltd.

Amazon Defendant 2

Magic Hover

Gyroor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William J. Leonard

Attorney at Wang, Leonard & Condon

33 North Lasalle Street, 2020

Chicago, IL 60602

Haoyi Chen

Attorney at Arch & Lake LLP

2500 Wilcrest Dr. Suite 301

Houston, TX 77042

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/4/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 2/4/2020. Counsel for plaintiff reports that no further contact has been made from defendants. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #9 is granted. Enter Order. Status hearing is set for 3/23/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Because the Court extended the temporary restraining order to 2/4/2020, plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #9 is entered and continued to 2/4/2020 at 8:45 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 1/17/2020. Oral motion by the plaintiff to extend the temporary restraining order to 2/4/2020 is granted. The presentment of plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction set for 1/22/2020 at 8:45 AM to stand. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Motion by William J. Leonard for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #9 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/22/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Leonard, William) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

9 #2

Exhibit

9 #1

Supplement

#9

(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff E-Link Technology Co. Ltd. for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit)(Leonard, William) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#8

(#8) TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/8/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16575689. Haoyi Chen (Chen, Haoyi) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

4 #18

Declaration

4 #17

Exhibit

4 #16

Exhibit

4 #15

Exhibit

4 #14

Exhibit

4 #12

Exhibit

4 #11

Exhibit

4 #10

Declaration

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/4/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 2/4/2020. Counsel for plaintiff reports that no further contact has been made from defendants. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #9 is granted. Enter Order. Status hearing is set for 3/23/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Because the Court extended the temporary restraining order to 2/4/2020, plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #9 is entered and continued to 2/4/2020 at 8:45 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 1/17/2020. Oral motion by the plaintiff to extend the temporary restraining order to 2/4/2020 is granted. The presentment of plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction set for 1/22/2020 at 8:45 AM to stand. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Motion by William J. Leonard for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #9 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/22/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Leonard, William) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff E-Link Technology Co. Ltd. for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit)(Leonard, William) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/8/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 1/7/2020. Attorney Haoyi Chen's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #4 is granted. Status hearing is set for 1/17/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16575689. Haoyi Chen (Chen, Haoyi) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Motion by William J. Leonard for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order, #4 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/7/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Leonard, William) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff E-Link Technology Co. Ltd. for temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Declaration, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Declaration)(Leonard, William) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Patents) (aee, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Leonard, William) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by E-Link Technology Co. Ltd.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16568423. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Leonard, William) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GYROOR is a litigant