This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 07:52:30 (UTC).

Dyson Technology Limited v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Dyson Technology Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06269

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dyson Technology Limited

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Shenzhen Anniser Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd

Shanghai Lulu Technology Co., Ltd

Lingxin Netwinner (Beijing) Technology Trade Co., Ltd

Jiangsu Henghua Industrial Products Trading Co., Ltd

Guangzhou Makron Electronic Technology Co., Ltd

Shenzhen Xurilai Electronic Digital Technology Co., Ltd

Innovative Life Boutique Store

KOKO Global Store

Golden Rex Store

CHJPRO Pro Hair Tool Products Store

HBMH HB Beauty-life Store

Hera Manufacturer Store

HBMH Manufacture Store

HBMH DRAPSHIPPING Store

Gmall Dropshipping Store

GREENS Dropshipping Store

LISM Officiel Store

CHJproDirect Store

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Lawrence J. Crain

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drive25Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Abby Marie Neu

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wackersuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive#2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) PRELIMINARY Injunction Order. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/5/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#36

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held by telephone on 1/5/2022. No one was present on behalf of defendants. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction #31 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk's office is directed to unseal the Schedule A to the Complaint #2 , Exhibit 1 to the Complaint #3 , Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Giles Samuel Lane #16 , and the TRO #25 . Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website www.ilnd.uscourts.com/instructions. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#35

(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone hearing as to the motion for preliminary injunction #31 is set for 1/5/2022 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#34

(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dyson Technology Limited as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 12/27/2021, answer due 1/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abby M. Neu)(Neu, Abby) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

31 #1

Exhibit 1

#31

(#31) MOTION by Plaintiff Dyson Technology Limited for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

16 #2

Exhibit 2-2

16 #1

Exhibit 2-1

#16

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held by telephone on 1/5/2022. No one was present on behalf of defendants. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction #31 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk's office is directed to unseal the Schedule A to the Complaint #2 , Exhibit 1 to the Complaint #3 , Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Giles Samuel Lane #16 , and the TRO #25 . Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website www.ilnd.uscourts.com/instructions. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#5

(#5) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Dyson Technology Limited for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 5

1 #3

Exhibit 4

1 #2

Exhibit 3

1 #1

Exhibit 2

#1

(#3) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Dyson Technology Limited Exhibit 1 Parts 1-2 regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 1/6/2022 (exr, ). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Shenzhen Anniser Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd, Shanghai Lulu Technology Co., Ltd, Lingxin Netwinner (Beijing) Technology Trade Co., Ltd, Jiangsu Henghua Industrial Products Trading Co., Ltd, Guangzhou Makron Electronic Technology Co., Ltd, Shenzhen Xurilai Electronic Digital Technology Co., Ltd, Innovative Life Boutique Store, KOKO Global Store, Golden Rex Store, CHJPRO Pro Hair Tool Products Store, HBMH HB Beauty-life Store, Hera Manufacturer Store, HBMH Manufacture Store, HBMH DRAPSHIPPING Store, Gmall Dropshipping Store, GREENS Dropshipping Store, LISM Officiel Store, CHJproDirect Store, Shop910437161 Store, S-mart h-o-me Store, LDEC Store, Shop911608444 Store, Cichla appliances Store, mayunbaba Store, LISM Appliances 3 Store, Imagery Store, TikTok US Store, Integrity sales Store, science life Store, Urione Store, S-mart H-ome Store, Urilon Store, A16B5LXZHX2G4L, xianerstd, Wuhanshijiangxiaqubangoufuzhuangjingyingbu, yuanbo., shijingyingm, qiujianamz, shuhairongamz, yongjiemyi, canqinouz, wuhanshijianghanqusenweisufuzhuangdian, yingchenmaoyi, xiaostarnt, zhonglumay, zhujianyina, xuemeish, daqimary, yuhuaimaof, Therese, fidget_spinners Store, Rossaflavor3, jerseyproshop, Newgema, MS Glam Store, YAOTA Direct, Overturee, Rightchoicee, Hetaoren, armanifamily Store, Cutemoment and hot_meal Store added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) PRELIMINARY Injunction Order. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/5/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held by telephone on 1/5/2022. No one was present on behalf of defendants. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction #31 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk's office is directed to unseal the Schedule A to the Complaint #2 , Exhibit 1 to the Complaint #3 , Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Giles Samuel Lane #16 , and the TRO #25 . Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to add ALL Defendant names listed in Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website www.ilnd.uscourts.com/instructions. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A telephone hearing as to the motion for preliminary injunction #31 is set for 1/5/2022 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dyson Technology Limited as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 12/27/2021, answer due 1/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abby M. Neu)(Neu, Abby) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE by Dyson Technology Limited re MOTION by Plaintiff Dyson Technology Limited for preliminary injunction #31 (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM by Dyson Technology Limited in support of motion for preliminary injunction #31 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen, #2 Exhibit 1)(Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION by Plaintiff Dyson Technology Limited for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (cm, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order #27 is granted. The Temporary Restraining Order entered on 12/3/2021 #25 is extended by a period of fourteen (14) days until 12/31/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (kl, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dyson Technology Limited by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dyson Technology Limited by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dyson Technology Limited by Lawrence J. Crain (Crain, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dyson Technology Limited by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Dyson Technology Limited for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Dyson Technology Limited Exhibit 1 Parts 1-2 regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 1/6/2022 (exr, ). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Dyson Technology Limited Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 1/6/2022 (exr, ). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Dyson Technology Limited; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18900334. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin R. Gaudio

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abby Marie Neu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jake Michael Christensen