This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2021 at 10:18:39 (UTC).

Dyno Nobel v. Johnson

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Dyno Nobel filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tena Campbell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00840

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tena Campbell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dyno Nobel

Defendant

Bob Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carley Leann Herrick

Attorney at PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER

201 S Main St Ste 1800, Po Box 45898

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-0898

Zack L. Winzeler

Attorney at PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER

201 S Main St Ste 1800, Po Box 45898

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-0898

Alan S. Mouritsen

Attorney at PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER

201 S Main St Ste 1800, Po Box 45898

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-0898

Defendant Attorneys

Evan S. Strassberg

Attorney at MICHAEL BEST & FRIEDRICH LLP

2750 E Cottonwood Pkwy Ste 560

Cottonwood Heights, UT 84121

Steven J. Joffee

Attorney at MICHAEL BEST & FRIEDRICH LLP

2750 E Cottonwood Pkwy Ste 560

Cottonwood Heights, UT 84121

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/30/20 (alt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

6 #4

Exhibit D - T. Martzall Linkedin Profile

6 #3

Exhibit C - Secretary of State Screenshot

6 #2

Exhibit B - Dyno Nobel Website Screenshot

6 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of Bob Johnson

#6

(#6) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Bob Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bob Johnson, #2 Exhibit B - Dyno Nobel Website Screenshot, #3 Exhibit C - Secretary of State Screenshot, #4 Exhibit D - T. Martzall Linkedin Profile) Attorney Evan S. Strassberg added to party Bob Johnson(pty:dft)(Strassberg, Evan). Added MOTION to Change Venue and corrected entry text on 12/30/2020 (alt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint: Defendant has up to and including December 30, 2020 to file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/18/20. (dla) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time

#4

(#4) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Defendant Bob Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) Attorney Steven J. Joffee added to party Bob Johnson(pty:dft)(Joffee, Steven) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Bob Johnson (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3811186) filed by Dyno Nobel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Winzeler, Zack) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff Dyno Nobel is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/30/20 (alt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketModification of Docket re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Change Venue. Error: Motion requesting 2 different reliefs was filed with only one relief selected. Correction: Second relief, "Change Venue" has been added to the entry. (alt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Bob Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bob Johnson, #2 Exhibit B - Dyno Nobel Website Screenshot, #3 Exhibit C - Secretary of State Screenshot, #4 Exhibit D - T. Martzall Linkedin Profile) Attorney Evan S. Strassberg added to party Bob Johnson(pty:dft)(Strassberg, Evan). Added MOTION to Change Venue and corrected entry text on 12/30/2020 (alt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint: Defendant has up to and including December 30, 2020 to file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/18/20. (dla) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Defendant Bob Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) Attorney Steven J. Joffee added to party Bob Johnson(pty:dft)(Joffee, Steven) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Bob Johnson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Bob Johnson (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3811186) filed by Dyno Nobel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Winzeler, Zack) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff Dyno Nobel is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan S. Mouritsen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zack L. Winzeler