This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2019 at 13:01:03 (UTC).

DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG et al v. Hunting Titan, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 DynaEnergetics GmbH Co KG filed an Other lawsuit against Hunting Titan, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01615

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG

DynaEnergetics US, Inc.

Defendants

Hunting Energy Services, Inc.

Hunting Titan, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa J. Moyles

Attorney at Moyles IP LLC

One Enterprise Dr, Ste 428

Shelton, CT 06484

Jason M. Rockman

Attorney at Moyles IP, LLC

One Enterprise Dr, Ste 428

Shelton, CT 06484

John G. Perry

Attorney at Womble Bond et al

271 17Th St Nw, Ste 2400

Atlanta, GA 30363

Preston H Heard

Attorney at Womble Bond et al

271 17Th St Nw, Ste 2400

Atlanta, GA 30363

Megan Charlotte Moore

Attorney at Rusty Hardin & Associates, LLP

5 Houston Center, 1401 Mckinney, Suite 2250

Houston, TX 77010

Barry Jeff Herman

Attorney at Womble Bond et al

100 Light St 26Th Fl

Baltimore, MD 21202

Ana J. Friedman

Attorney at Womble Bond et al

One West Fourth St

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

Barry Herman

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson LLP

100 Light St., 26Th Floor

Baltimore, MA 21202

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew G Reeves

Attorney at Locke Lord et al

600 Travis, Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002-3095

Charles Stewart Baker

Attorney at Locke Lord

600 Travis, Ste 2800

Houston, TX 77002

Jason Allan Saunders

Attorney at Arnold, Knobloch & Saunders, L.L.P.

4900 Woodway Drive, Ste 900

Houston, TX 77056

Christopher Paul McKeon

Attorney at Arnold, Knobloch & Saunders, L.L.P.

4900 Woodway Dr., Suite 900

Houston, TX 77056

Ryan E Dornberger

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2800 Chase Tower, 600 Travis St

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

44 #1

Redacted First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial

#44

#42

41 #1

Proposed Order

#41

#40

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#39

#38

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Filing of Redacted First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Redacted First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial)(Moore, Megan) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) SEALED DOCUMENT First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Moore, Megan) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) PROTECTIVE ORDER re: #41 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Hunting Energy Services, Inc., Hunting Titan, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Charles) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Transcript (Sealed) of proceedings held on held on May 29, 2019,. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dye, filed. (gdye, ) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Hunting for Transcript of scheduling conference on 5/29/2019. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Dye, filed. (Reeves, Matthew) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT/RECORD by Hunting Energy Services, Inc., Hunting Titan, Inc., filed.(Reeves, Matthew) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Megan C. Moore for Transcript of Initial Conference on 05/29/19 before Judge Rosenthal. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Dye, filed. (Moore, Megan) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Docket(#36) Minute entry for proceedings before the Hon. Lee H. Rosenthal. Initial conference held on May 29, 2019. DynaEnergeticss motion to seal the preliminary injunction is granted. (Docket Entry No. 21). The parties must submit an agreed protective order no later than June 7, 2019. The court denied Hunting's motion to stay briefing and discovery on the preliminary injunction. (Docket Entry No. 35). DynaEnergetics must file an amended complaint no later than June 21, 2019, identifying with reasonable particularity the non-public information that Hunting would have needed to design the H-2 Perforating System. DynaEnergetics must submit the documents that contained this non-public information, including the documents provided to the EOG Resources, Patriot Well Solutions, and Anderson Perforating Limited. Hunting must produce the January 2018 provisional patent application and related documents. DynaEnergetics's motion to expedite the schedule and discovery is granted in part and denied in part, as stated on the record. (Docket Entry No. 23). The court authorized DynaEnergetics and Hunting to each take two depositions. The court authorized documents productions from between 3 and 5 custodians. The parties must complete this discovery no later than August 16, 2019. The court will hold a status conference on August 26, 2019, at 4:00 pm, to schedule the preliminary-injunction hearing and other outstanding work. The court denied the motion to dismiss as moot because the court has granted leave to amend and ordered additional discovery. (Docket Entry No. 30). Appearances: Lisa Moyles/Barry Herman/Megan Moore for Pltf. and Jason Saunders/Charles Baker/Matthew Reeves/Ryan Dornberger for Defts.(Court Reporter: G. Dye), filed.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) SEALED MOTION To Stay Discovery and Briefing on Preliminary Injunction by Hunting Energy Services, Inc., Hunting Titan, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Baker, Charles) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hunting Titan, Inc., filed.(Herman, Barry) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hunting Energy Services, Inc., filed.(Herman, Barry) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Lisa J. Moyles to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2019. (Herman, Barry) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Ana J. Friedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2019. (Herman, Barry) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Preston H. Heard to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2019. (Herman, Barry) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Barry J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2019. (Herman, Barry) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22361313) filed by DynaEnergetics GmbH & Co. KG, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herman, Barry) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hunting Titan, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hunting Energy Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DynaEnergetics US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Gregory Perry(Designation Retained)