This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 09:05:27 (UTC).

DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH et al v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Schlumberger Technology Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00225

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Counter Plaintiffs, Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH

DynaEnergetics US, Inc.

Schlumberger Technology Corporation

Counter Defendant, Defendant and Counter Plaintiff

Schlumberger Technology Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Plaintiff, Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Barry J. Herman

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

100 Light Street, 26Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

Preston H. Heard

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

271 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30363

Brian Craft

Attorney at Findlay Craft, P.C.

102 N. College Ave.Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Eric H. Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft, P.C.

102 N. College Ave.Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Michael J Newton

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

2200 Ross Avenuesuite 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

Christine H. Dupriest

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

271 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30363

Julie C. Giardina

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

100 Light Street, 26Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

Jason M. Rockman

Attorney at Moyles IP, LLC

One Enterprise Drive, Suite 428

Shelton, CT 06484

Lisa J. Moyles

Attorney at Moyles IP, LLC

One Enterprise Drive, Suite 428

Shelton, CT 06484

Lauren U. Baker

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

271 17Th Street, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30363

Mark D. Siegmund

Attorney at Steckler Wayne Cochran Cherry, PLLC

8416 Old Mcgregor Rd.

Waco, TX 76712

Monique Danielle Mead

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W. Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

Nicholas T. Tsui

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree St., Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Scott Jeffrey Pivnick

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

950 F Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20007

 

Court Documents

45 #1

Proposed Order

#45

(#45) Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#44

(#44) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#43

RESTRICTED

#42

RESTRICTED

#41

(#41) Text Order GRANTING #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren U. Baker for DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, and for DynaEnergetics US, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#40

(#40) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric H. Findlay for Lauren U. Baker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15516114) by on behalf of DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#39

(#39) ORDER, (Markman Hearing RESET for 12/9/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Jeffrey Pivnick on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation. Attorney Scott Jeffrey Pivnick added to party Schlumberger Technology Corporation(pty:dft) (Pivnick, Scott) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Joinder of Parties due by 1/20/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 12/5/2022 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske Jury Trial set for 12/5/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING the Proposed Schedule #45 . Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PTlc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 12-9-21, Proceedings Transcribed: Markman hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114, Email: kmdaviscsr@yahoo.com. (kd) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Markman Hearing held on 12/9/2021. Case called for Markman Hearing. Court heard argument on disputed claim terms and set the final claim terms. Discovery is now open. Parties will get together to suggest a trial date and get with the law clerk - it will probably be 12 - 14 months from now. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.) (jc5) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Text Order GRANTING #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren U. Baker for DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, and for DynaEnergetics US, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric H. Findlay for Lauren U. Baker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15516114) by on behalf of DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER, (Markman Hearing RESET for 12/9/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Jeffrey Pivnick on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Corporation. Attorney Scott Jeffrey Pivnick added to party Schlumberger Technology Corporation(pty:dft) (Pivnick, Scott) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. Schlumberger Technology Corporation served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (bw) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric H. Findlay for Preston H. Heard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14569590) by on behalf of DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric H. Findlay for Barry J. Herman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14569583) by on behalf of DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Findlay, Eric) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/9/2021) (lad). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14568286). No Summons requested at this time, filed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DynaEnergetics US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Schlumberger Technology Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monique Danielle Mead