This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2022 at 09:15:18 (UTC).

Dyer v. Chaney et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Dyer filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Chaney. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis T. Babcock, Daniel D. Domenico and Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01483

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

Presiding Judges

Lewis T. Babcock

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Angela Dyer

Angela (I) Dyer

Defendants

Tracy L. Chaney

BMW of North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Ryan McCarley

Attorney at Forester Haynie, PLLC

400 N Saint Paul St, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorney

Deana R. Dagner

Attorney at Dagner Schluter Mitzner Werber LLC

8400 East Prentice Avenue, Suite 1401

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8503477)Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party Angela Dyer(pty:pla), filed by Angela Dyer.(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/14/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01483-DDD. (trvo, ) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Tracy L. Chaney by Plaintiffs Angela Dyer, Angela (I) Dyer. (McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS REQUEST as to BMW of North America, LLC by Plaintiffs Angela Dyer, Angela (I) Dyer. (McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Dyer, Angela (I) Dyer. BMW of North America, LLC served on 6/28/2022, answer due 7/19/2022. (McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 21 July 2022. The Court is unable to determine the citizenship of any party to this action and is unable to determine whether it has jurisdiction of Plaintiff's claims. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that, on or before August 11, 2022, Plaintiffs shall show cause, if any there be, in writing, why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint ANSWER TO ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND Attorney Deana R. Dagner added to party Tracy L. Chaney(pty:dft) by Tracy L. Chaney.(Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMW of North America, LLC, Tracy L. Chaney, filed by Angela Dyer, Angela (I) Dyer.(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

13 #13

Main Document

13 #1

Exhibit Redline Amended Complaint

14 #14

Main Document

14 #1

Exhibit Declaration

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 by Plaintiffs Angela Dyer, Angela (I) Dyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE re #12 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Angela Dyer, Angela (I) Dyer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline Amended Complaint)(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMW of North America, LLC, Tracy L. Chaney, filed by Angela Dyer, Angela (I) Dyer.(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint ANSWER TO ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND Attorney Deana R. Dagner added to party Tracy L. Chaney(pty:dft) by Tracy L. Chaney.(Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 21 July 2022. The Court is unable to determine the citizenship of any party to this action and is unable to determine whether it has jurisdiction of Plaintiff's claims. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that, on or before August 11, 2022, Plaintiffs shall show cause, if any there be, in writing, why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/21/2022. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, ) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Dyer, Angela (I) Dyer. BMW of North America, LLC served on 6/28/2022, answer due 7/19/2022. (McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS REQUEST as to BMW of North America, LLC by Plaintiffs Angela Dyer, Angela (I) Dyer. (McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Tracy L. Chaney by Plaintiffs Angela Dyer, Angela (I) Dyer. (McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/14/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01483-DDD. (trvo, ) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8503477)Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party Angela Dyer(pty:pla), filed by Angela Dyer.(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deana R. Dagner