Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/18/2021 at 12:51:54 (UTC).

DWAV LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 DWAV LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John J. O'Sullivan and Marcia G. Cooke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-21508

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John J. O'Sullivan

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DWAV LLC

1717 N. Bayshore Dr., Ste. 212

Miami, FL 33132

Defendant

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

1441 Brickell Ave Ste 1200, Miami

Miami, FL 33131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Andrew Berman

Attorney at Joshua A. Berman, PLLC

1717 North Bayshore Drive, Suite 212

Miami, FL 33132

Defendant Attorneys

Brian John Lechich

1200 Four Seasons Tower, 1441 Brickell Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

Jose Antonio Ortiz

Attorney at Homer Bonner Jacobs

1441 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Jury Trial set for 2/28/2022 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 2/23/2022 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Amended Pleadings due by 7/9/2021. Expert Discovery due by 10/22/2021. Fact Discovery due by 9/10/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 7/9/2021. Mediation Deadline 11/5/2021. In Limine Motions due by 12/9/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/17/2021. Motions due by 9/17/2021. Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/9/2021. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Filing Discovery: First Request for Production of Documents by DWAV LLC.(Berman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Notice of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by DWAV LLC.(Berman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and ORDER Regarding Court Practices and Procedures. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Joshua Andrew Berman (Berman, Joshua) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Jury Trial set for 2/28/2022 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 2/23/2022 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Amended Pleadings due by 7/9/2021. Expert Discovery due by 10/22/2021. Fact Discovery due by 9/10/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 7/9/2021. Mediation Deadline 11/5/2021. In Limine Motions due by 12/9/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/17/2021. Motions due by 9/17/2021. Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/9/2021. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pretrial Deadlines, Pretrial Conference and Trial Date, #2 Exhibit B - Election to Jurisdiction By a U.S. Magistrate Judge for Final Disposition of Motions)(Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Filing Discovery: First Request for Production of Documents by DWAV LLC.(Berman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Notice of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by DWAV LLC.(Berman, Joshua) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and ORDER Regarding Court Practices and Procedures. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Joshua Andrew Berman (Berman, Joshua) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14618606, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket & Filings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lechich, Brian) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant