This case was last updated from PACER on 08/28/2021 at 07:04:16 (UTC).

DUVERNAY et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 DUVERNAY filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against MERCK CO , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HARVEY BARTLE, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-20036

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HARVEY BARTLE, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WYNN DUVERNAY

PETER DUVERNAY JR.

Defendants

MERCK & CO., INC.

MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.

MCKESSON CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOLLIE K WELLINS

Attorney at MARC J BERN & PARTNERS LLP

60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 950

New York, NY 10165

MARGARET CORDNER

Attorney at MARC J BERN & PARTNERS LLP

60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 950

New York, NY 10165

Defendant Attorney

DINO S. SANGIAMO

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 E Pratt St Ste 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MOLLIE K WELLINS on behalf of WYNN DUVERNAY, PETER DUVERNAY JR. with Certificate of Service(WELLINS, MOLLIE) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

4 #1

*Restricted*

4 #4

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#3

(#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-74) transferring case to the USDC for the EDPA. (dm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/24/2021.] (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/24/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

1 #4

Summons MSD

1 #3

Summons Merck

1 #2

Summons McKesson

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet ccs

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MOLLIE K WELLINS on behalf of WYNN DUVERNAY, PETER DUVERNAY JR. with Certificate of Service(WELLINS, MOLLIE) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:21-cv-13511. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-74) transferring case to the USDC for the EDPA. (dm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/24/2021.] (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/24/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketJudge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/24/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12619570) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WYNN DUVERNAY, PETER DUVERNAY JR.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ccs, #2 Summons McKesson, #3 Summons Merck, #4 Summons MSD)(CORDNER, MARGARET) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/24/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where McKesson Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DINO S. SANGIAMO