This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2022 at 09:54:57 (UTC).

DuVaney v. Delta Airlines, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 DuVaney filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Delta Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02186

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marsha R DuVaney

Defendants

Delta Airlines, Inc.

The Administrative Committee of Delta Airlines, Inc.

Greg Tahvonen

Mindy Davison

Janet Brunk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Don Springmeyer

Attorney at Kemp Jones LLP

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, 17Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Alysa Grimes

Attorney at Kemp Jones, LLP

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, 17Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Douglas P. Needham

Attorney at Izard

29 South Main Street, Suite 305

West Hartford, CT 06107

Gregory Y. Porter

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP

1054 31St Street, Nw, Suite 230

Washington, DC 20007

Mark G. Boyko

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP

1054 31St Street, Nw, Suite 230

Washington, DC 20007

Michael J Gayan

Attorney at Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Oren Faircloth

Attorney at Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP

29 South Main Street, Suite 305

West Hartford, CT 06107

Robert A. Izard

Attorney at Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP

29 South Main Street, Suite 305

West Hartford, CT 06107

Defendant Attorney

Scott M. Mahoney

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips, LLP

300 S Fourth Street, Suite 1500

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Douglas P. Needham for Marsha R. DuVaney and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/19/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#19

(#19) ORDER Granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Oren Faircloth for Marsha R. DuVaney and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/19/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Robert A. Izard for Marsha R. DuVaney and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/19/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#17

(#17) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Douglas Needham and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6763870) by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#16

(#16) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Oren Faircloth and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6763854) by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#15

(#15) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert Izard and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6763826) by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Janet Brunk, Mindy Davison, Delta Airlines, Inc., Greg Tahvonen, The Administrative Committee of Delta Airlines, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Janet Brunk, Mindy Davison, Delta Airlines, Inc., Greg Tahvonen, The Administrative Committee of Delta Airlines, Inc. answer due 3/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#12

(#12) First STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint, by Defendants Janet Brunk, Mindy Davison, Delta Airlines, Inc., Greg Tahvonen, The Administrative Committee of Delta Airlines, Inc. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marsha R DuVaney re #1 Complaint,, #10 Summons Issued. Delta Airlines, Inc. served on 12/14/2021. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Marsha R DuVaney. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marsha R DuVaney re #1 Complaint,, #10 Summons Issued. Delta Airlines, Inc. served on 12/14/2021. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Douglas P. Needham for Marsha R. DuVaney and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/19/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER Granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Oren Faircloth for Marsha R. DuVaney and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/19/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Robert A. Izard for Marsha R. DuVaney and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/19/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Douglas Needham and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6763870) by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Oren Faircloth and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6763854) by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert Izard and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6763826) by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Janet Brunk, Mindy Davison, Delta Airlines, Inc., Greg Tahvonen, The Administrative Committee of Delta Airlines, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Janet Brunk, Mindy Davison, Delta Airlines, Inc., Greg Tahvonen, The Administrative Committee of Delta Airlines, Inc. answer due 3/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) First STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint, by Defendants Janet Brunk, Mindy Davison, Delta Airlines, Inc., Greg Tahvonen, The Administrative Committee of Delta Airlines, Inc. (Mahoney, Scott) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marsha R DuVaney re #1 Complaint,, #10 Summons Issued. Delta Airlines, Inc. served on 12/14/2021. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Marsha R DuVaney. (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Douglas P. Neeham, Gregory Y. Porter, Mark G. Boyko, Oren Faircloth, and Robert A. Izard to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/24/2021. (no image attached) (KF) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (KF) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Marsha R DuVaney. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Springmeyer, Don) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Janet Brunk, Mindy Davison, Delta Airlines, Inc., Greg Tahvonen, The Administrative Committee of Delta Airlines, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6729163) by Marsha R DuVaney. Proof of service due by 3/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Springmeyer, Don) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delta Air Lines Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott M. Mahoney Esquire