This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2021 at 08:15:49 (UTC).

Dutra v. Motel 6 Operating L.P., et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 Dutra filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Motel 6 Operating L P . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-08588

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Dutra

Defendants

Joy Aguilar

Motel 6 Operating L.P.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Levon Shant Yepremian

Attorney at West Coast Employment Lawyers

350 S Grand Avenue, 3350

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ronald Leonardo Zambrano

Attorney at WEST COAST TRIAL LAWYERS, APLC

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3350

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Steve Lou Hernandez

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Levi William Heath

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

2000 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 400 North Tower

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ryan M. Estes

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

2000 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 400, North Tower

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Angela Dutra.. (Zambrano, Ronald) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motel 6 Operating L.P., of Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins' Standing Orders (Hernandez, Steve) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2 021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motel 6 Operating L.P., re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 1 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice (Other) [Proof of Service of Removal Documents] (Hernandez, Steve) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Motel 6 Operating L.P., re 1 Notice of Removal, of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. section 1446(d) (Hernandez, Steve) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Motel 6 Operating L.P., identifying Corporate Parent IBL Limited, LLC, Corporate Parent G6 Hospitality LLC, Other Affiliate Motel 6 Operating LP for Motel 6 Operating L.P.,. re 1 Notice of Removal, (Hernandez, Steve) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Declaration of Michael Moore in Support of Notice of Removal

1 #2

Declaration of Rebecca Lennard in Support of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Declaration of Steve L. Hernandez in Support of Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monterey County Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV002982. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15275829). Filed byMotel 6 Operating L.P.,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve L. Hernandez in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Rebecca Lennard in Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Michael Moore in Support of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hernandez, Steve) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • Docket(#10) SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/16/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/21/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Angela Dutra.. (Zambrano, Ronald) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motel 6 Operating L.P., of Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins' Standing Orders (Hernandez, Steve) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2 021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docket(#1) Answer to Removal Complaint (See Exhibit G of Removal Complaint) by Motel 6 Operating L.P. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motel 6 Operating L.P., re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 1 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice (Other) [Proof of Service of Removal Documents] (Hernandez, Steve) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/18/2020. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Motel 6 Operating L.P., re 1 Notice of Removal, of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. section 1446(d) (Hernandez, Steve) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Motel 6 Operating L.P., identifying Corporate Parent IBL Limited, LLC, Corporate Parent G6 Hospitality LLC, Other Affiliate Motel 6 Operating LP for Motel 6 Operating L.P.,. re 1 Notice of Removal, (Hernandez, Steve) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monterey County Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV002982. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15275829). Filed byMotel 6 Operating L.P.,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve L. Hernandez in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Rebecca Lennard in Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Michael Moore in Support of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hernandez, Steve) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOTEL 6 OPERATING L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Levi William Heath

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steve L. Hernandez