This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2021 at 08:20:38 (UTC).

Dutra v. J.R. Simplot Company

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Dutra filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against J R Simplot Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley and Carolyn K. Delaney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01054

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tony Dutra

Defendant

J.R. Simplot Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christina M. Lucio

Attorney at Farnaes & Lucio, APC

2235 Encinitas Blvd.

Encinitas, CA 92024

James Ross Hawkins

Attorney at James Hawkins APLC

9880 Research Drive, Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorneys

Rabia Zubaida Reed

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

Suite 2500, 500 Capitol Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95814

Michael John Nader

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

500 Capitol Mall, Suite 2500

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) REPLY by J.R. Simplot Company re #10 Opposition to Motion. (Nader, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#10

(#10) OPPOSITION by Tony Dutra to #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Hawkins, James) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

9 #3

Proposed Order

9 #2

Declaration

9 #1

Points and Authorities

9 #9

Main Document

8 #1

Proof of Service

8 #8

Main Document

1 #9

Proof of Service

1 #8

Certificate of Interested Parties

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Declaration

1 #5

Declaration

1 #4

Declaration

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Declaration

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UOE-2021-0002402 by J.R. Simplot Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9651403) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Certificate of Interested Parties, #9 Proof of Service)(Reed, Rabia) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY by J.R. Simplot Company re #10 Opposition to Motion. (Nader, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/5/2021: On the Court's own motion, Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #9 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 8/19/2021 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. Defendant may still file a reply brief in accordance with Local Rule 230(d) and the 8/19/2021 date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) OPPOSITION by Tony Dutra to #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Hawkins, James) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to DISMISS by J.R. Simplot Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Nader, Michael) Modified on 7/21/2021 (Coll, A). (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of COMPLIANCE re Removal Action by J.R. Simplot Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nader, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against J.R. Simplot Company by Tony Dutra.(Lucio, Christina) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Christina M. Lucio on behalf of Tony Dutra. Attorney Lucio, Christina M. added. (Lucio, Christina) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/21/2021 EXTENDING the deadline to file a response to the Complaint to 7/5/2021. (Coll, A) Modified on 7/6/2021 (Krueger, M). (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Rule 12 Motion by J.R. Simplot Company. (Reed, Rabia) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reed, Rabia) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Becknal, R) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UOE-2021-0002402 by J.R. Simplot Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9651403) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Certificate of Interested Parties, #9 Proof of Service)(Reed, Rabia) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.R. Simplot Foundation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael John Nader

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rabia Z Reed