This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2019 at 08:04:42 (UTC).

Dury v. True

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Dury filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against True. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03078

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Matthew James Dury

Florence, CO 81226

Respondents

ADX Florence

True

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Envelope

#11

(#11) Sworn Affidavit for Criminal Acts, by Mathew J. Dury (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (apesa, ) Modified on 12/19/2019 to correct text (apesa, ). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#10

(#10) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Petitioner Matthew James Dury. (angar, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#9

(#9) AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Matthew James Dury.(angar, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE to Court of Direct Act of Terrorism of Torture, by Petitioner Matthew James Dury (angar, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#7

(#7) MINUTE ORDER. Applicant has filed two Notices (ECF Nos. #5 , #6 ). The Notices contain unsubstantiated allegations regarding the Court; however, it also appears that Applicant requests copies of the forms needed to cure deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/13/2019. forms mailed as ordered (angar, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to the court by Petitioner Matthew James Dury (evana, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE to the Court Violation of Federal Laws by Petitioner Matthew James Dury (evana, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order the action may be dismissed without further notice. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as on the incorrect form, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/29/2019.(angar, ) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Petitioner Matthew James Dury. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#1

(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Matthew James Dury.(alave, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Sworn Affidavit for Criminal Acts, by Mathew J. Dury (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (apesa, ) Modified on 12/19/2019 to correct text (apesa, ). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Petitioner Matthew James Dury. (angar, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Matthew James Dury.(angar, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE to Court of Direct Act of Terrorism of Torture, by Petitioner Matthew James Dury (angar, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER. Applicant has filed two Notices (ECF Nos. #5 , #6 ). The Notices contain unsubstantiated allegations regarding the Court; however, it also appears that Applicant requests copies of the forms needed to cure deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/13/2019. forms mailed as ordered (angar, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE to the court by Petitioner Matthew James Dury (evana, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE to the Court Violation of Federal Laws by Petitioner Matthew James Dury (evana, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order the action may be dismissed without further notice. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as on the incorrect form, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/29/2019.(angar, ) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Petitioner Matthew James Dury. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Matthew James Dury.(alave, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where True is a litigant