Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2021 at 09:49:15 (UTC).

DURHAM v. PAGE et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 DURHAM filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against PAGE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOE L. WEBSTER and LORETTA C. BIGGS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01114

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

Presiding Judge

LORETTA C. BIGGS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANNON LEE DURHAM

Salisbury, NC 28144

Defendants

CARLYLE SHERRILL

ROWAN COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

GLORIA L. JONES

KANNAPOLIS POLICE DEPARTMENT

CHRIS HILL

JEREMY DANIEL PAGE

TIMOTHY GOULD

BROOK STANCIL

ROWAN COUNTY MAGISTRATES OFFICE

TREY RANDAL HINTON

THOMAS KING

 

Court Documents

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00672. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER on initial review of Plaintiff's #1 Complaint: Plaintiff's action is transferred to the Middle District of North Carolina; and the Clerk is instructed to terminate this action. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/09/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 12/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Administrative Remedy Statement IS NOT Requested. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 12/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 12/03/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(js) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 12/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/04/2020)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shannon Lee Durham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(js) (Main Document 1 replaced with .pdf with blank pages removed on 12/10/2020) (ejb). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 12/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED for Screening. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00672. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER on initial review of Plaintiff's #1 Complaint: Plaintiff's action is transferred to the Middle District of North Carolina; and the Clerk is instructed to terminate this action. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/09/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 12/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Administrative Remedy Statement IS NOT Requested. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 12/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 12/03/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(js) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 12/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketPro Se Law Clerk Referral to PSLC: 1 (js) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 12/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Shannon Lee Durham (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 12/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shannon Lee Durham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(js) (Main Document 1 replaced with .pdf with blank pages removed on 12/10/2020) (ejb). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 12/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROWAN COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY is a litigant