This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2020 at 13:24:49 (UTC).

Durham v. LG Chem, Ltd et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 Durham filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against LG Chem, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02737

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Durham

Defendants

LG Chem America, Inc.

LG Chem, Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William A. Levin

Attorney at Levin Simes Abrams LLP

1700 Montgomery, Suite 250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Angela J. Nehmens

Attorney at Levin Simes Abrams LLP

1700 Montgomery, Suite 250

San Francisco, CA 94111

David A. Sleppy

Attorney at Cathey & Strain

P.O. Box 689, 649 Irvin Street

Cornelia, GA 30531

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP-ATL

Suite 1700, 201 17Th Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30363

James T. Irvin, III

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough

1320 Main Street, Ste 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

Steven H Campbell

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP-ATL

Suite 1700, 201 17Th Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30363

Melissa Foster Bird

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP -WV

Suite 200, 949 Third Avenue

Huntington, WV 25701

Rachel Atkin Hedley

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough-Columbia

P.O. Box 11070, Suite 1700, 1320 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29211-1070

 

Court Documents

#35

RESTRICTED

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

RESTRICTED

#18

#14

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice James T. Irvin, III for LG Chem America, Inc. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/27/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #29 APPLICATION for Admission of James T. Irvin, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10049713).. Attorney James T. Irvin, III added appearing on behalf of LG Chem America, Inc. (nmb) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Campbell, Steven) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #30 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan between Plaintiff and LGCAI. Discovery ends on 4/6/2021. The parties are directed to file an amended Joint Scheduling Report within 14 days after LG Chem, LTD files an appearance in this action. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/24/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #14 Certificate of Interested Persons, #18 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (North, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery (Initial Disclosures, First Set of Interrogatories and RFPs to Plaintiff) by LG Chem America, Inc..(North, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) APPLICATION for Admission of James T. Irvin, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10049713).by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #15 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial), to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Admission of Angela J. Nehmens Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9925900).by Bryan Durham. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #7 Return of Service Executed by Bryan Durham. LG Chem America, Inc. served on 7/1/2020. Answer due 7/22/2020. (Sleppy, David) Modified on 7/7/2020 to edit text and add service/ answer due date (jed). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by Bryan Durham. LG Chem America, Inc. served on 7/1/2020. Answer due 7/22/2020. (Sleppy, David) Modified on 7/7/2020 to edit text and add service/ answer due date (jed). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on July 1, 2020. (ash) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to LG Chem America, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to LG Chem, Ltd. (eop) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Bryan Durham. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9849382) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LG Chem America, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William A. Levin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angela J. Nehmens