This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2021 at 08:45:47 (UTC).

Durepo v. Eastman Chemical Company

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 Durepo filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Eastman Chemical Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark G. Mastroianni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-30195

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark G. Mastroianni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard J Durepo, Jr.

Defendant

Eastman Chemical Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keith A. Minoff

Attorney at The Law Offices of Keith A. Minoff, Esq.

1350 Main Street, Suite 1003

Springfield, MA 01103

Defendant Attorneys

Patricia M. Rapinchuk

Attorney at Robinson, Donovan,

1500 Main Street, Suite 1600

Springfield, MA 01115

Hunter S. Keil

Attorney at Robinson Donovan, P.C.

1500 Main Street, Suite 1600

Springfeild, MA 01115

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Category Sheet

#2

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Minoff, Keith) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATE COURT Record Eastman Chemical Company summons served on 12/16/2020, answer due 1/6/2021.. (Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Rule 16.1 Budget Certification of Defendant, Eastman Chemical Company. (Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eastman Chemical Company. (Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Eastman Chemical Company.(Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#4) Remark: A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal has been emailed today to Defendants Counsel for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter S. Keil on behalf of Eastman Chemical Company (Keil, Hunter) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Eastman Chemical Company ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8566464 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet)(Rapinchuk, Patricia) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less