This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/15/2020 at 09:42:08 (UTC).

DURCHHOLZ v. ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 DURCHHOLZ filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLAIRE L. DURCHHOLZ

Defendant

ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aaron J. Williamson

Defendant Attorney

Krysta Kaye Gumbiner

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint to 1/9/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/10/2020. (JRB) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/9/21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, filed by Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gumbiner, Krysta) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on JANUARY 21, 2021 at 11:00 a.m., Evansville Time (CST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/24/2020.(AAS) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Parties First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC., re #1 Complaint. (Gumbiner, Krysta) Modified on 11/4/2020 (AAS). (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta Kaye Gumbiner on behalf of Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Gumbiner, Krysta) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit Proof of Service

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service, filed by CLAIRE L. DURCHHOLZ. ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC. served on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Williamson, Aaron) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC. (JRB) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J. Williamson on behalf of Plaintiff CLAIRE DURCHHOLZ. (Williamson, Aaron) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC., filed by CLAIRE DURCHHOLZ. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6229710) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Williamson, Aaron) Modified on 10/16/2020 (REO). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint to 1/9/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/10/2020. (JRB) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/9/21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, filed by Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gumbiner, Krysta) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on JANUARY 21, 2021 at 11:00 a.m., Evansville Time (CST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/24/2020.(AAS) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Parties First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC., re #1 Complaint. (Gumbiner, Krysta) Modified on 11/4/2020 (AAS). (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta Kaye Gumbiner on behalf of Defendant ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Gumbiner, Krysta) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service, filed by CLAIRE L. DURCHHOLZ. ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC. served on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Williamson, Aaron) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC. (JRB) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J. Williamson on behalf of Plaintiff CLAIRE DURCHHOLZ. (Williamson, Aaron) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES, INC., filed by CLAIRE DURCHHOLZ. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6229710) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Williamson, Aaron) Modified on 10/16/2020 (REO). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less