This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 07:37:45 (UTC).

Durbin v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 Durbin filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Grady Jennings and Colin H. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00473

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Grady Jennings

Referral Judge

Colin H. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tara A. Durbin

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Mariner Finance, LLC

Personal Finance Company LLC

P'Pool & Roy, PLLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James H. Lawson

Attorney at Lawson at Law, PLLC

115 S. Sherrin Avenue, Suite 5

Louisville, KY 40207

James R. McKenzie

Attorney at James R. McKenzie Attorney, PLLC

115 S. Sherrin Avenue, Suite 5

Louisville, KY 40207

Defendant Attorneys

John Michael Williams

Attorney at Williams Kilpatrick, PLLC

3151 Beaumont Centre Circle, Suite 375

Lexington, KY 40517

Anna-Katrina S. Christakis

Attorney at Pilgrim Christakis LLP

321 N. Clark Street, 26Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654

Michelle Duncan

Attorney at Boehl Stopher & Graves, LLP - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, Suite 2300

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Proposed Order

16 #1

Memorandum in Support

#16

(#16) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant P'Pool & Roy, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Duncan, Michelle) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendants Mariner Finance, LLC and Personal Finance Company LLC by Tara A. Durbin (Lawson, James) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by P'Pool & Roy, PLLC. (Duncan, Michelle) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/25/2019 granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: The deadline for Defendants Mariner Finance, LLC and Personal Finance Company LLC to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 8/23/2019. cc: Counsel(JM) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Mariner Finance, LLC, Personal Finance Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MF Raven Holdings, Inc. for Mariner Finance, LLC. by Mariner Finance, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MF USA Holdings, Inc. for Personal Finance Company LLC. by Personal Finance Company LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

1 #5

Summons Tendered

1 #4

Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Agreed Judgment

1 #2

Exhibit B - Collection Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - PFC Promissory Note

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC, P'Pool & Roy, PLLC, and Personal Finance Company LLC. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2895381, filed by Tara A. Durbin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PFC Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Collection Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Agreed Judgment, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Tendered) (MNM) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant P'Pool & Roy, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Duncan, Michelle) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendants Mariner Finance, LLC and Personal Finance Company LLC by Tara A. Durbin (Lawson, James) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • (#14) TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/12/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM- USMJ-CHL. (ARM) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by P'Pool & Roy, PLLC. (Duncan, Michelle) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/25/2019 granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: The deadline for Defendants Mariner Finance, LLC and Personal Finance Company LLC to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 8/23/2019. cc: Counsel(JM) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Mariner Finance, LLC, Personal Finance Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MF Raven Holdings, Inc. for Mariner Finance, LLC. by Mariner Finance, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MF USA Holdings, Inc. for Personal Finance Company LLC. by Personal Finance Company LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Anna-Katrina S. Christakis on behalf of Personal Finance Company LLC (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/18/2019 granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (AME) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Anna-Katrina S. Christakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2903211. by Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC, P'Pool & Roy, PLLC, and Personal Finance Company LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (MNM) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC, P'Pool & Roy, PLLC, and Personal Finance Company LLC. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2895381, filed by Tara A. Durbin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PFC Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Collection Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Agreed Judgment, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Tendered) (MNM) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARINER FINANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant