This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/22/2021 at 14:52:58 (UTC).

Duran v. Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Duran filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Tafoya and Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01129

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deanna Duran

Defendant

Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexander F. Beale

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Shannon Joelle Marino

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Colorado Springs

5536 Library Lane

Colorado Springs, CO 80918

Defendant Attorneys

John M. Palmeri

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Katelyn Shea Werner

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Andrew Keith Lavin

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and Reset Scheduling Order Deadline by Defendant Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Lavin, Andrew) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#21

(#21) REPLY to Response to #17 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Lavin, Andrew) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#20

(#20) RESPONSE to #17 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Deanna Duran. (Marino, Shannon) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

17 #4

Exhibit D

17 #3

Exhibit C

17 #2

Exhibit B

17 #1

Exhibit A

#17

(#17) Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#6

(#18) ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H - Register of Actions

1 #7

Exhibit G - Entry of Appearance

1 #5

Exhibit E -Police Report (Redacted)

1 #4

Exhibit D-Affidavit of Service

1 #3

Exhibit C-Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A-Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30443. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7833470), filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Summons, #3 Exhibit C-Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E -Police Report (Redacted), #6 Exhibit F - Certification, #7 Exhibit G - Entry of Appearance, #8 Exhibit H - Register of Actions, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Motion for Stay of Discovery. The court, having considered the factors set forth in String Cheese Incident, LLC. v. Stylus Shows, Inc., 02CV01934LTBPAC, 2006 WL 894955, at *2 (D.Colo. Mar. 30, 2006), finds a stay of discovery is appropriate pending ruling on the partial motion to dismiss. Discovery in this matter is STAYED. The parties shall file a status report within ten days of ruling on the partial motion to dismiss to advise whether a scheduling conference should be set. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/21/21. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 ) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #22 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and Reset Scheduling Order Deadline filed by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/20/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) (Entered: 06/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and Reset Scheduling Order Deadline by Defendant Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Lavin, Andrew) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response to #17 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Lavin, Andrew) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE to #17 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Deanna Duran. (Marino, Shannon) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docket(#19) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/4/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexander F. Beale on behalf of Deanna DuranAttorney Alexander F. Beale added to party Deanna Duran(pty:pla) (Beale, Alexander) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE REASSIGNED.pursuant to #14 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01129-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket(#10) ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Andrew Keith Lavin was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket(#8) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, CCCS Rule 16.1, and Complaint upon Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company on 03/25/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT against Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Deanna Duran.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket(#5) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Keith Lavin on behalf of Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Andrew Keith Lavin added to party Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lavin, Andrew) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John M. Palmeri on behalf of Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney John M. Palmeri added to party Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Palmeri, John) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30443. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7833470), filed by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Summons, #3 Exhibit C-Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E -Police Report (Redacted), #6 Exhibit F - Certification, #7 Exhibit G - Entry of Appearance, #8 Exhibit H - Register of Actions, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Werner, Katelyn) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shannon Joelle Marino