This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:32:24 (UTC).

Duran v. Morton

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Duran filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Morton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Miguel A. Torres and Philip R. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00358

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Miguel A. Torres

Presiding Judge

Philip R. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Andres Duran

El Paso, TX 79938

Defendant

UMC Christina Morton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

John Edward Untereker

Attorney at El Paso County Attorney's Office

500 E. San Antonio, Rm. 503

El Paso, TX 79902

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Certified Mail Receipt of #5 Order, (dt) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER REQUESTING NOTIFICATION OF CURRENT ADDRESS. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall update the Court as to his current address within seven (7) days of receiving this Order. If no such update is received, the Court will assume thatPlaintiff's address has not changed and will proceed accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail, by certified mail, a copy ofthis Order and the order requesting supplemental information (ECF No. 2) to Plaintiff at the following address Daniel Andres DuranTDCJ #02297580, Walker Sayle Unit, 4176 FM 1800, Breckenridge, TX 76424. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of receipt of these orders, Plaintiff shall file a certified copy of the trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the prisoner for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint or notice of appeal, obtained from the appropriate official of each prison at which the prisoner is or was confined, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2).. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (dt) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#4

(#4) Certified Mail Return Receipt of #2 Order,, (dt) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Certified Mail Receipt of #2 Order,, (dt) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER REQUESTING DOCUMENTATION. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of receipt of this order, Plaintiff shall file a certified copy of the trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the prisoner for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint or notice ofappeal, obtained from the appropriate official of each prison at which the prisoner is or was confined, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court is directed to mail, via certifiedmail, a copy of this Order to Plaintiff.. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (dt) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Andres Duran. (Attachments: #1 Complaint). Motions referred to Judge Miguel A. Torres. (jg1) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certified Mail Receipt of #5 Order, (dt) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUESTING NOTIFICATION OF CURRENT ADDRESS. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall update the Court as to his current address within seven (7) days of receiving this Order. If no such update is received, the Court will assume thatPlaintiff's address has not changed and will proceed accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail, by certified mail, a copy ofthis Order and the order requesting supplemental information (ECF No. 2) to Plaintiff at the following address Daniel Andres DuranTDCJ #02297580, Walker Sayle Unit, 4176 FM 1800, Breckenridge, TX 76424. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of receipt of these orders, Plaintiff shall file a certified copy of the trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the prisoner for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint or notice of appeal, obtained from the appropriate official of each prison at which the prisoner is or was confined, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2).. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (dt) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certified Mail Return Receipt of #2 Order,, (dt) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certified Mail Receipt of #2 Order,, (dt) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER REQUESTING DOCUMENTATION. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of receipt of this order, Plaintiff shall file a certified copy of the trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the prisoner for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint or notice ofappeal, obtained from the appropriate official of each prison at which the prisoner is or was confined, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court is directed to mail, via certifiedmail, a copy of this Order to Plaintiff.. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (dt) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the Standing Order this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Torres (jg1) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Andres Duran. (Attachments: #1 Complaint). Motions referred to Judge Miguel A. Torres. (jg1) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.