This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2020 at 09:49:10 (UTC).

Duprey v. AECOM C&E, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 Duprey filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AECOM C E, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00320

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda Duprey

Defendant

AECOM C&E, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather M. Collins

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Anne Hunter

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Ashley S. Walter

Attorney at Collins & Hunter PLLC

7000 Executive Center Drive, Building Two Suite 320

Brentwood, TN 37027

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel R. Rosenblatt

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C. (Nashville)

333 Commerce Street, Suite 1450

Nashville, TN 37201

Elise Hofer McKelvey

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C. (Nashville)

333 Commerce Street, Suite 1450

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit 1 - Peterson Declaration

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT to #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Consent Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Amanda Duprey. (Collins, Heather) Modified on 6/12/2020 (vh). (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's unopposed motion to extend the time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss or transfer case and to continue the initial case management conference (Docket No. #14 ), which is GRANTED. The time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss (Docket No. #8 ) is EXTENDED to June 11, 2020. Defendant may file an optional reply as provided for in Local Rule 7.01(a)(4). The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED for October 28, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/1/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to #8 MOTION to Dismiss, or, Alternatively to Transfer Case and to Continue Case Management Confernce by Amanda Duprey. (Collins, Heather) Modified on 5/28/2020 (vh). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID-19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 issued on March 16, 2019, amended on March 23, 2020, and on April 29, 2020, and amended again on May 22, 2020, the initial case management conference in this case, scheduled for June 1, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., will be held telephonically. Counsel should use the following dial-in information to participate in the telephonic initial case management conference: Dial-in number: 877-402-9753; Access Code: 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/26/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(h)(2), the District Judge is provided notice that on May 13, 2020, Defendant filed a motion to dismiss with supporting memorandum (Docket Nos. #8 , #9 ). Any response by Plaintiff shall be filed pursuant to Rule 12, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Local Rule 7.01(a)(3). An optional reply may be filed within seven (7) days of the filing of the response, and shall not exceed five (5) pages. The Clerk is directed to forward the motion to the Honorable William L. Campbell, Jr., District Judge, for his consideration of Defendant's motion to dismiss. The initial case management conference remains scheduled for 10:30 a.m., June 1, 2020, whether or not a ruling has entered on this pending motion, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/15/2020. (vh) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Rachel R. Rosenblatt and Elise Hofer McKelvey. (vh) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AECOM C&E, Inc.. (Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AECOM C&E, Inc.. (Rosenblatt, Rachel) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively to Transfer Case filed by AECOM C&E, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Peterson Declaration)(Rosenblatt, Rachel) Modified on 5/14/2020 (vh). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Case by AECOM C&E, Inc. (Rosenblatt, Rachel) Modified on 5/14/2020 (vh). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Amanda Duprey. AECOM C&E, Inc. served on 4/22/2020. (Hunter, Anne) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER; This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 4/16/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (vh) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins, Anne Hunter, and Ashley S. Walter. (vh) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to AECOM C&E, Inc. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AECOM C&E, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3123986), filed by Amanda Duprey. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AECOM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elise Hofer McKelvey