This case was last updated from PACER on 05/17/2021 at 09:19:30 (UTC).

Dupree Carr v. True et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Dupree Carr filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against True. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pro Se Docket and Richard G. Kopf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00117

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pro Se Docket

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Kopf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr

Norfolk, NE 68701

Defendants

Hunter Lewis

Dr. Juvet Ch'e

Marsha Schwartz

Chris Luebe

Julie Batenhorst

Cheryl Heiman

Bonnie Bergland

Todd Phelps

Larry Sobler

Patricia True

Alyssa Colver

Andrew Corbin

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION to Add New Defendants to Amended Complaint on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr.(KMM) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Submit Supporting Evidence on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (LKO) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Submit Supporting Evidence on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (LKO) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Submit Supporting Evidence on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (KMM) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Update Names on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (KMM) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Submit Supporting Evidence on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (LKO) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LRM) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#4

(#4) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (LKO) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Julie Batenhorst, Bonnie Bergland, Juvet Ch'e, Alyssa Colver, Andrew Corbin, Cheryl Heiman, Hunter Lewis, Chris Luebe, Todd Phelps, Marsha Schwartz, Larry Sobler, and Patricia True filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (LKO) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Add New Defendants to Amended Complaint on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr.(KMM) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Submit Supporting Evidence on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (LKO) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Submit Supporting Evidence on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (LKO) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Submit Supporting Evidence on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (KMM) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Update Names on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (KMM) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Submit Supporting Evidence on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (LKO) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LRM) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (LKO) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Julie Batenhorst, Bonnie Bergland, Juvet Ch'e, Alyssa Colver, Andrew Corbin, Cheryl Heiman, Hunter Lewis, Chris Luebe, Todd Phelps, Marsha Schwartz, Larry Sobler, and Patricia True filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Tralan DeVonte JoVonni Dupree Carr. (LKO) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less