This case was last updated from PACER on 01/21/2020 at 08:48:03 (UTC).

Dunn v. Baca et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Dunn filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Baca. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Miranda M. Du and William G. Cobb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00702

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Miranda M. Du

Referral Judge

William G. Cobb

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Patrick Dunn

Carson City, NV 89702

Respondents

Isidro Baca

Nevada Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rene Valladares

Attorney at Federal Public Defender

411 E Bonneville, Suite 250

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Respondent Attorney

Aaron D. Ford-AG

Attorney at Nevada Attorney General

100 North Carson Street

Carson City, NV 89701

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Petitioner Patrick Dunn. (AB) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

#2

(#2) NOTICE from USDC advising case against Isidro Baca, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:19-cv-00702-MMD-WGC. (LH) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Patrick Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(LH) Modified on 11/25/2019 to correct file date(LH). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER - The Clerk will file the petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. (ECF No. #1 -1.) The motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #4 ) is granted. FPD is appointed provisionally as counsel. The FPD will have 30 days from the date of entry of this order (2/9/2020) either to undertake representation of Petitioner or to indicate to the Court the office's inability to do so. The Clerk shall add AG, as counsel for Respondents. The Clerk electronically shall serve both the AG and the FPD a copy of the petition and a copy of this order. (E-service 1/10/2020; petition upon subsequent filing.) Respondents counsel must enter a notice of appearance within 21 days of entry of this order (1/31/2020), but no further response will be required from Respondents until further order of the Court. Clerk will provide copies of all prior filings to both the AG and FPD in a manner consistent with the Clerk's current practice, such as regeneration of notices of electronic filing. (Regenerated NEF # 1-5 to effect e-service to AG and FPD on 1/10/2020.) Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 1/10/2020 to reflect copy mailed to P at NNCC on 1/13/2020 (DRM). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER denying ECF No. #1 IFP application; giving Petitioner 45 days from the date that this order is entered to pay the $5.00 filing fee; failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this action; directing the Clerk to send Petitioner two copies of this order (Mailed to P on 11/27/2019). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#7

(#7) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Patrick Dunn. (Filed pursuant to ECF No. #6 Order. E-service to AG and FPD on 1/10/2020.) (DRM) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Patrick Dunn. (Filed pursuant to ECF No. #6 Order. E-service to AG and FPD on 1/10/2020.) (DRM) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER - The Clerk will file the petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. (ECF No. #1 -1.) The motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #4 ) is granted. FPD is appointed provisionally as counsel. The FPD will have 30 days from the date of entry of this order (2/9/2020) either to undertake representation of Petitioner or to indicate to the Court the office's inability to do so. The Clerk shall add AG, as counsel for Respondents. The Clerk electronically shall serve both the AG and the FPD a copy of the petition and a copy of this order. (E-service 1/10/2020; petition upon subsequent filing.) Respondents counsel must enter a notice of appearance within 21 days of entry of this order (1/31/2020), but no further response will be required from Respondents until further order of the Court. Clerk will provide copies of all prior filings to both the AG and FPD in a manner consistent with the Clerk's current practice, such as regeneration of notices of electronic filing. (Regenerated NEF # 1-5 to effect e-service to AG and FPD on 1/10/2020.) Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 1/10/2020 to reflect copy mailed to P at NNCC on 1/13/2020 (DRM). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • (#5) RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00, receipt number NVRNO-004808. (no image attached) (DRM) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Petitioner Patrick Dunn. (AB) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER denying ECF No. #1 IFP application; giving Petitioner 45 days from the date that this order is entered to pay the $5.00 filing fee; failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this action; directing the Clerk to send Petitioner two copies of this order (Mailed to P on 11/27/2019). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE from USDC advising case against Isidro Baca, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:19-cv-00702-MMD-WGC. (LH) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Patrick Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(LH) Modified on 11/25/2019 to correct file date(LH). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.