This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2021 at 22:45:19 (UTC).

Dunn-Silvey v. Costco Wholesale Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Dunn-Silvey filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Costco Wholesale Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis T. Babcock and Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01416

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis T. Babcock

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonieth P. Dunn-Silvey

Silverthorne, CO 80497

Defendant

Costco Wholesale Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer K. O'Connell

Attorney at Queener Law LLC

1001 Bannock Street, Suite 458

Denver, CO 80204

Allison Ruth Pritchard

Attorney at Pritchard Law Offices Inc.

P.O. Box 2509

Silverthorne, CO 80498

Defendant Attorneys

J. Scott Lasater

Attorney at Lasater & Martin PC

8822 South Ridgeline Boulevard, Suite 405

Highlands Ranch, CO 80129

Emily Ann Swanson

Attorney at Lasater & Martin PC

8822 South Ridgeline Boulevard, Suite 405

Highlands Ranch, CO 80129

Randy Lane Sego

Attorney at Suzana Skrabo Law Offices-London KY

P.O. Box 7218

London, KY 40742

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice #20 , this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/30/2020. (ebuch) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#20

(#20) Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Sego, Randy) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Antonieth P. Dunn-Silvey (Pritchard, Allison) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Randy Lane Sego on behalf of Costco Wholesale CorporationAttorney Randy Lane Sego added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft) (Sego, Randy) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF MEDIATION by Plaintiff Antonieth P. Dunn-Silvey (O'Connell, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#13

#12

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Continuation of Main Document Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #5

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D Affidavit of Service

1 #3

Exhibit C Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A Complaint and Jury Demand

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice #20 , this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/30/2020. (ebuch) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Sego, Randy) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER In light of #18 Notice of Settlement, the Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2020 11:00 AM is VACATED. The parties shall file Dismissal Papers or a report regarding the status of settlement on or before 9/25/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/24/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Antonieth P. Dunn-Silvey (Pritchard, Allison) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER The parties shall participate in the Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2020 11:00 AM TELEPHONICALLY by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/18/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1 Plaintiff's F.R.C.P. rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures : by Plaintiff Antonieth P. Dunn-Silvey.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Privilege Log)(O'Connell, Jennifer) Modified on 8/11/2020 to add title (angar, ). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Randy Lane Sego on behalf of Costco Wholesale CorporationAttorney Randy Lane Sego added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft) (Sego, Randy) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF MEDIATION by Plaintiff Antonieth P. Dunn-Silvey (O'Connell, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/27/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/20/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/10/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/9/2020. (ebuch) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance On Behalf of Plaintiff by Jennifer K. O'Connell on behalf of Antonieth P. Dunn-SilveyAttorney Jennifer K. O'Connell added to party Antonieth P. Dunn-Silvey(pty:pla) (O'Connell, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation All parties do not consent.. (Lasater, J.) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#6) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Costco Wholesale Corporation on 28 April 2020 (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Costco Wholesale Corporation, filed by Antonieth P. Dunn-Silvey.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Scott Lasater on behalf of Costco Wholesale CorporationAttorney J. Scott Lasater added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft) (Lasater, J.) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Swanson, Emily) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale Corporation from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020cv030867. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7300065), filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C Summons, #4 Exhibit D Affidavit of Service, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Continuation of Main Document Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Swanson, Emily) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randy Lane Sego

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily A. Swenson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Scott Lasater