This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2019 at 12:54:53 (UTC).

Sheila Dunn et al v. Rodd S. McMinn et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 Sheila Dunn filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Rodd S McMinn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and R. Gary Klausner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03822

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sheila Dunn

Russell Dunn

Defendants

Wealth Management Group of Upstate New York, Inc.

Metlife Securities, Inc.

Michael Solinkski

Rodd S. McMinn

Hartford Life Insurance Company

DOES 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacob Nessim Segura

Attorney at Jacob N Segura, A Law Corporation

11400 West Olympic Boulevard, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer S Gutenberg

Attorney at Markun Zusman Freniere and Compton LLP

17383 West Sunset Boulevard Suite A380

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272

Wendy M Thomas

Attorney at Markun Zusman Freniere and Compton LLP

17383 Sunset Boulevard Suite A380

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272

Kelly Ryan Graf

Attorney at Dentons LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

Judith Shophet Sidkoff

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

Laura L Geist

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1999 Harrison Street Suite 1300

Oakland, CA 94612

Thomas Worger

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1999 Harrison Street Suite 1300

Oakland, CA 94612-4709

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

Notice of Case Management Conference

1 #4

Notice of Case Assignment

1 #3

Complaint

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Rodd S. McMinn, Michael Solinkski, Wealth Management Group of Upstate New York, Inc..(Thomas, Wendy) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company.(Geist, Laura) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wealth Management Group of Upstate New York, Inc., (Thomas, Wendy) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Judith Shophet Sidkoff counsel for Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company. Adding Judith Shophet Sidkoff as counsel of record for Hartford Life Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company. (Attorney Judith Shophet Sidkoff added to party Hartford Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Sidkoff, Judith) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Wendy M Thomas on behalf of Defendants Rodd S. McMinn, Michael Solinkski, Wealth Management Group of Upstate New York, Inc. (Attorney Wendy M Thomas added to party Rodd S. McMinn(pty:dft), Attorney Wendy M Thomas added to party Michael Solinkski(pty:dft), Attorney Wendy M Thomas added to party Wealth Management Group of Upstate New York, Inc.(pty:dft))(Thomas, Wendy) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINDER filed by Defendants Rodd S. McMinn, Michael Solinkski, Wealth Management Group of Upstate New York, Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Thomas, Wendy) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hartford Life Insurance Company answer now due 5/31/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company.(Geist, Laura) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 05/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Russell Dunn and Sheila Dunn in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/19/2019, attached as Exhibit 3. (jtil) (Entered: 05/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 05/02/2019. (Graf, Kelly) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company, identifying Hartford Life Insurance Company. (Graf, Kelly) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company. (Graf, Kelly) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19stcv09518 Receipt No: 0973-23668203 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Hartford Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Complaint, #4 Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Notice of Case Management Conference) (Attorney Kelly Ryan Graf added to party Hartford Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Graf, Kelly) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSI Financial Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hartford Life Insurance Company is a litigant