This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2021 at 10:53:33 (UTC).

Dunn et al v. John Doe 1-60 et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Dunn filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against John Doe 1-60. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Celeste F. Bremer and Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00053

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Celeste F. Bremer

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Verchon Debrossard

Makenzie Moler

Michael Klingenberg

Cierra Dunn

Jaquan Patton

Defendants

Jeremy Sprague

Tyler Moffatt

Deb VanVelzen

Kirk Bagby

Clark Allen

Chad Nicolino

Nicholas Valentine

Jake Forrester

Trudy Paulson

Dana Wingert

Daniel Blom

Jacob Hedlund

Jeffrey George

City of Des Moines, Iowa

Ernesto Escobar Hernandez

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gina Messamer

Attorney at PARRISH KRUIDENIER DUNN BOLES GRIBBLE GENTRY

2910 Grand Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50312

Defendant Attorneys

John O. Haraldson

Attorney at DES MOINES CITY ATTORNEY

400 Robert D. Ray Drive

Des Moines, IA 50309-1891

Gregory R. Brown

Attorney at DUNCAN GREEN PC

400 Locust St, Suite 380

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

Katherine Elizabeth Anderegg

Attorney at DENTONS DAVIS BROWN PC (DSM)

215 10Th Street, Suite 1300

Des Moines, IA 50309

Michael C. Richards

Attorney at DENTONS DAVIS BROWN PC (DSM)

215 10Th Street, Suite 1300

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Haraldson, John) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Jake Forrester, Tyler Moffatt Regarding Firm Name Change and Contact Information (Richards, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Clark Allen, Kirk Bagby, Daniel Blom, City of Des Moines, Iowa, Ernesto Escobar Hernandez, Jeffrey George, Kyle Gruver, Jacob Hedlund, Shawna Isaac, John Doe 1-60, Chad Nicolino, Trudy Paulson, Jeremy Sprague, Nicholas Valentine, Deb VanVelzen, Dana Wingert, Bradley Youngblut.(Haraldson, John) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

1 #11

Exhibit Ex I Answer for Def Moffatt

1 #10

Exhibit Ex H Answer for Def Forrester

1 #9

Exhibit Ex G Appearance for Def Moffatt

1 #8

Exhibit Ex F Appearance for Def Forrester

1 #7

Exhibit Ex E Acceptance Def Moffatt

1 #6

Exhibit Ex D Acceptance Def Forrester

1 #5

Exhibit Ex C Original Notices

1 #4

Exhibit Ex B Acceptance of Service City of Des Moines Defendants

1 #3

Exhibit Ex A Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #2

Supplement Consent to Remove from other Defendants

1 #1

Supplement Rule 81 Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ernesto Escobar Hernandez, Trudy Paulson, Clark Allen, Kirk Bagby, Deborah VanVelzen, Jacob Hedlund, Nichola Valentine, Bradley Youngblut, Jeremy Sprague, Jeffrey George, Kyle Gruver, Shawna Isaac, Chad Nicolino, Dana Wingert, Daniel Blom, City of Des Moines, Iowa from Iowa District Court Polk County, case number LACL149462. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4402672., filed by Ernesto Escobar Hernandez, Trudy Paulson, Clark Allen, Kirk Bagby, Deborah VanVelzen, Jacob Hedlund, Nichola Valentine, Bradley Youngblut, Jeremy Sprague, Jeffrey George, Kyle Gruver, Shawna Isaac, Chad Nicolino, Dana Wingert, Daniel Blom, City of Des Moines, Iowa. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rule 81 Removal, #2 Supplement Consent to Remove from other Defendants, #3 Exhibit Ex A Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit Ex B Acceptance of Service City of Des Moines Defendants, #5 Exhibit Ex C Original Notices, #6 Exhibit Ex D Acceptance Def Forrester, #7 Exhibit Ex E Acceptance Def Moffatt, #8 Exhibit Ex F Appearance for Def Forrester, #9 Exhibit Ex G Appearance for Def Moffatt, #10 Exhibit Ex H Answer for Def Forrester, #11 Exhibit Ex I Answer for Def Moffatt)(Haraldson, John) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Haraldson, John) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Jake Forrester, Tyler Moffatt Regarding Firm Name Change and Contact Information (Richards, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Clark Allen, Kirk Bagby, Daniel Blom, City of Des Moines, Iowa, Ernesto Escobar Hernandez, Jeffrey George, Kyle Gruver, Jacob Hedlund, Shawna Isaac, John Doe 1-60, Chad Nicolino, Trudy Paulson, Jeremy Sprague, Nicholas Valentine, Deb VanVelzen, Dana Wingert, Bradley Youngblut.(Haraldson, John) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ernesto Escobar Hernandez, Trudy Paulson, Clark Allen, Kirk Bagby, Deborah VanVelzen, Jacob Hedlund, Nichola Valentine, Bradley Youngblut, Jeremy Sprague, Jeffrey George, Kyle Gruver, Shawna Isaac, Chad Nicolino, Dana Wingert, Daniel Blom, City of Des Moines, Iowa from Iowa District Court Polk County, case number LACL149462. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4402672., filed by Ernesto Escobar Hernandez, Trudy Paulson, Clark Allen, Kirk Bagby, Deborah VanVelzen, Jacob Hedlund, Nichola Valentine, Bradley Youngblut, Jeremy Sprague, Jeffrey George, Kyle Gruver, Shawna Isaac, Chad Nicolino, Dana Wingert, Daniel Blom, City of Des Moines, Iowa. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rule 81 Removal, #2 Supplement Consent to Remove from other Defendants, #3 Exhibit Ex A Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit Ex B Acceptance of Service City of Des Moines Defendants, #5 Exhibit Ex C Original Notices, #6 Exhibit Ex D Acceptance Def Forrester, #7 Exhibit Ex E Acceptance Def Moffatt, #8 Exhibit Ex F Appearance for Def Forrester, #9 Exhibit Ex G Appearance for Def Moffatt, #10 Exhibit Ex H Answer for Def Forrester, #11 Exhibit Ex I Answer for Def Moffatt)(Haraldson, John) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gina Messamer