This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2021 at 09:02:25 (UTC).

Dunlop v. Dunlop et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Dunlop filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Dunlop. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10447

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Dunlop

Defendants

Angelique Dunlop

Angelique Murekatete Dunlop

John Dunlop

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth R. L. Parker

Attorney at Parker Keough LLP

343 Washington Street, Suite 200

Newton, MA 02458

Nathaniel J. Lichtin

Attorney at Parker Keough LLLP

51 Winchester Street, Suite 205

Newton, MA 02461

 

Court Documents

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) MOTION Alternative Service of Process with Certificate of Service by Andrew Dunlop.(Lichtin, Nathaniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2021: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/2/2021) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Angelique Dunlop, John Dunlop. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

1 #2

Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Angelique Dunlop and John Dunlop. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8682412 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Andrew Dunlop. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Parker, Kenneth) Modified on 3/16/2021 to adjust docket text. (Currie, Haley). (Entered: 03/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION Alternative Service of Process with Certificate of Service by Andrew Dunlop.(Lichtin, Nathaniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2021: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/2/2021) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Angelique Dunlop, John Dunlop. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Angelique Dunlop and John Dunlop. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8682412 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Andrew Dunlop. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Parker, Kenneth) Modified on 3/16/2021 to adjust docket text. (Currie, Haley). (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth R. L. Parker