This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2021 at 09:44:11 (UTC).

Dunham v. Wheeler

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Dunham filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Wheeler. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Zilly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00163

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Zilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFF DUNHAM

Defendant

SINEAD ANNAMARIE WHEELER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael G Atkins

Attorney at ATKINS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY PLLC

113 Cherry Street, #18483

Seattle, WA 98104-2205

Jennifer Kent Faubion

Attorney at CAIRNCROSS & HEMPELMANN

524 2Nd Ave Ste 500

Seattle, WA 98104-2323

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - C

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i), re #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) (MW) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Jeff Dunham (Faubion, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joint Status Report due by 4/12/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/29/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/12/2021. (SRS) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (CDA) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Sinead AnnaMarie Wheeler (CDA) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketJudge Thomas S. Zilly added. (CDA) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT re #1 Complaint, Copyright Report by Plaintiff JEFF DUNHAM (Faubion, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) SINEAD ANNAMARIE WHEELER (Receipt # AWAWDC-6930928) Attorney Jennifer Kent Faubion added to party JEFF DUNHAM(pty:pla), filed by JEFF DUNHAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Faubion, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael G Atkins