This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2021 at 08:27:06 (UTC).

Duncan v. Scott Barnes, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 Duncan filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Scott Barnes, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric N. Vitaliano and Lois Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05898

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

Referral Judge

Lois Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugene Duncan

Defendant

Scott Barnes, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradly Gurion Marks

Attorney at The Marks Law Firm, PC

175 Varick Street, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10014

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Scott Barnes, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugene Duncan. Scott Barnes, Inc. served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugene Duncan. Scott Barnes, Inc. served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Scott Barnes, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Scott Barnes, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14960540 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Eugene Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradly Gurion Marks