This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2021 at 08:20:33 (UTC).

Duncan v. Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Duncan filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Jack Henry Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are W. Brian Gaddy and Roseann Ketchmark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-03280

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

W. Brian Gaddy

Roseann Ketchmark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sabrina Briony Duncan

Defendants

Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.

The Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan

UMR, Inc.

Quantum Health, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony E. Rothert

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Missouri Foundation-StL

906 Olive Street, Suite 1130

St. Louis, MO 63101

Caroline E. Reynolds

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

1800 M Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Gillian R. Wilcox

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Missouri Foundation-KCMO

406 W. 34Th Street, Suite 420

Kansas City, MO 64111

Leila Bijan

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

485 Madison Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Jessie Steffan

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Missouri Foundation-StL

906 Olive Street, Suite 1130

St. Louis, MO 63101

Molly E. Carney

Attorney at ACLU of Missouri

906 Olive St., Ste 1130

St. Louis, MO 63101

Defendant Attorneys

Amy L. Blaisdell

Attorney at Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, PC-StL

10 South Broadway, Suite 2000

St. Louis, MO 63102-1774

Heather Mehta

Attorney at Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, PC-StL

10 South Broadway, Suite 2000

St. Louis, MO 63102-1774

Lauren Abbott Daming

Attorney at Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, PC-StL

10 South Broadway, Suite 2000

St. Louis, MO 63102-1774

Amber D. Reece

Attorney at Figari & Davenport, LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75202

Andrew G. Jubinsky

Attorney at Figari & Davenport, LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75202

Ann E Buckley

Attorney at Buckley & Buckley - StL

800 Market Street, Suite 2900

St. Louis, MO 63101

Danne Wayne Webb

Attorney at Horn, Aylward & Bandy, LLC

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

David John Butler

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

65 East State Street, Suite 1000

Columbus, OH 43215

Rachel Smoot

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

65 East State Street, Suite 1000

Columbus, OH 43215

Andrea S. McMurtry

Attorney at Horn, Aylward & Bandy, LLC

2600 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64108

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Defendant Quantum Health, Inc..(Webb, Danne) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#43

(#43) Joint MOTION for extension of time to file Joint Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan filed by Amy L. Blaisdell on behalf of Jack Henry & Associates, Inc., The Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/4/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Blaisdell, Amy) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#42

(#42) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Leila Bijan on behalf of Plaintiff Sabrina Briony Duncan.(Bijan, Leila) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#41

(#41) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Amy L. Blaisdell on behalf of Defendants Jack Henry & Associates, Inc., The Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan.(Blaisdell, Amy) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#40

(#40) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Frank Neuner(Bijan, Leila) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#39

(#39) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Ann E Buckley on behalf of Defendant UMR, Inc..(Buckley, Ann) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#37

(#37) Motion to allow Andrew G. Jubinsky to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7704476) filed by Ann E Buckley on behalf of UMR, Inc.. (Buckley, Ann) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#35

(#36) ORDER granting #35 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Amber D. Reece for UMR, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#34

No Description Available

33 #3

Exhibit C

33 #2

Exhibit B

33 #1

Exhibit A

33 #33

Main Document

#32

No Description Available

#31

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

29 #2

Exhibit 2

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Defendant Quantum Health, Inc..(Webb, Danne) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Joint MOTION for extension of time to file Joint Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan filed by Amy L. Blaisdell on behalf of Jack Henry & Associates, Inc., The Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/4/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Blaisdell, Amy) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Leila Bijan on behalf of Plaintiff Sabrina Briony Duncan.(Bijan, Leila) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Amy L. Blaisdell on behalf of Defendants Jack Henry & Associates, Inc., The Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan.(Blaisdell, Amy) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Frank Neuner(Bijan, Leila) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Ann E Buckley on behalf of Defendant UMR, Inc..(Buckley, Ann) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting #37 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Andrew G. Jubinsky for UMR, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Motion to allow Andrew G. Jubinsky to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7704476) filed by Ann E Buckley on behalf of UMR, Inc.. (Buckley, Ann) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER granting #35 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Amber D. Reece for UMR, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of appearance by Lauren Abbott Daming on behalf of Jack Henry & Associates, Inc., The Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan (Attorney Lauren Abbott Daming added to party Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Abbott Daming added to party The Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Daming, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of appearance by Amy L. Blaisdell on behalf of Jack Henry & Associates, Inc., The Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan (Attorney Amy L. Blaisdell added to party Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy L. Blaisdell added to party The Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Blaisdell, Amy) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of appearance by Jessie Steffan on behalf of Sabrina Briony Duncan (Attorney Jessie Steffan added to party Sabrina Briony Duncan(pty:pla))(Steffan, Jessie) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Jack Henry & Associates, Inc., Quantum Health, Inc., The Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan, UMR, Inc., and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 11/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 and #3 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Caroline E. Reynolds and Leila Bijan for Sabrina Briony Duncan allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to allow Leila Bijan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7644573) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Sabrina Briony Duncan. (Rothert, Anthony) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to allow Caroline E. Reynolds to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7644572) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Sabrina Briony Duncan. (Rothert, Anthony) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jack Henry & Associates, Inc., Quantum Health, Inc., The Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan, UMR, Inc. filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Sabrina Briony Duncan. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7644568. Service due by 1/24/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rothert, Anthony) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Quantum Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UMR INC. LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ann E. Buckley