This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:25:42 (UTC).

Duncan v. Embree et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Duncan filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Embree. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca Grady Jennings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00890

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Grady Jennings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emoshia L. Duncan

Lagrange, KY 40031

Defendants

Jonathan Kimbrell

Peter Embree

Dagon Moon

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/9/2019 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Finance; LLCC, Attn: Inmate Accounts (CDF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order & envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Emoshia L. Duncan (ALS) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Complaint Exhibits

#9

(#9) MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Plaintiff Emoshia L. Duncan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order & envelope) (CDF) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#4

(#4) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Letter to the Clerk from Emoshia L. Duncan requesting handbook, court rules, forms, and advice in regard to case. (CDF) (Entered: 12/21/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Peter Embree, Jonathan Kimbrell, Dagon Moon filed by Emoshia L. Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibits, #2 Summons Tendered) (ALS) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

7 #1

tendered First Amended Complaint

7 #2

Summons

7 #3

cover letter

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Emoshia L. Duncan (Attachments: #1 tendered First Amended Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 cover letter) (CDF) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#8

(#8) REQUEST for Production of Documents by Emoshia L. Duncan. (CDF) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

1 #2

Summons Tendered

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Plaintiff Emoshia L. Duncan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order & envelope) (CDF) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST for Production of Documents by Emoshia L. Duncan. (CDF) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Emoshia L. Duncan (Attachments: #1 tendered First Amended Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 cover letter) (CDF) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter to the Clerk from Emoshia L. Duncan requesting handbook, court rules, forms, and advice in regard to case. (CDF) (Entered: 12/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/9/2019 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Finance; LLCC, Attn: Inmate Accounts (CDF) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Emoshia L. Duncan by Emoshia L. Duncan. (ALS) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Emoshia L. Duncan (ALS) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Peter Embree, Jonathan Kimbrell, Dagon Moon filed by Emoshia L. Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibits, #2 Summons Tendered) (ALS) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.