This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2021 at 08:37:11 (UTC).

Duncan v. Bayer CropScience LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Duncan filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bayer CropScience LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen R. Clark and Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00651

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Stephen R. Clark

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darren Duncan

Defendants

Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.

Cargill Incorporated

BASF Corporation

CHS Inc.

Growmark Inc.

Tenkoz Inc.

Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.

Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.

Univar Solutions, Inc.

Winfield Solutions, LLC

Bayer CropScience L.P.

Bayer CropScience Inc

Syngenta Corporation

Corteva Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derek Y. Brandt

Attorney at MCCUNE WRIGHT LLP - Edwardsville

231 North Main Street, Suite 20

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Leigh M. Perica

Attorney at MCCUNE WRIGHT LLP - Edwardsville

231 North Main Street, Suite 20

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Connor P. Lemire

Attorney at MCCUNE WRIGHT LLP - Edwardsville

231 North Main Street, Suite 20

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Defendant Attorneys

Barack S. Echols

Attorney at KIRKLAND AND ELLIS - Chicago

300 N. Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Eric J. Mahr

Attorney at FRESHFIELDS BRUCKHAUS US LLP - DC

700 13Th Street Nw, 10Th Floor

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Lara Bueso Bach

1395 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33129

Troy A. Bozarth

Attorney at HEPLER BROOM LLC - Edwardsville

130 N. Main Street, P.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0510

Kathy L. Osborn

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER LLP - Indianapolis

300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1750

Colby A. Kingsbury

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER LLP - Chicago

311 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

James R. McGibbon

999 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30309-3996

Timothy J. McCaffrey

Attorney at EVERSHEDS SUTHERLAND US LLP - Chicago

900 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 1000

Chicago, IL 60611

Lee A. Peifer

Attorney at EVERSHEDS SUTHERLAND US LLP - Atlanta

999 Peachtree St Ne, Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30309

Matt D. Basil

Attorney at WILLKIE AND FARR LLP - Chicago

300 N. Lasalle Dr., Ste 50Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654-3456

Nathan P. Eimer

Attorney at EIMER STAHL LLP

224 S. Michigan Ave., Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

Brian Chang

224 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

Erick E. VanDorn

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - Belleville

525 W. Main Street, Suite 300

Belleville, IL 62220

Sharon B. Rosenberg

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

Christopher M. Hohn

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

Paul S. Mishkin

Attorney at DAVIS POLK LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Donald M. Flack, Jr.

115 N. Second Street

Edwardsville, IL 62025

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#148

109 #1

*Restricted*

#109

#108

#107

RESTRICTED

#106

#104

#41

1 #16

Summons

1 #15

Summons

1 #14

Summons

1 #12

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

115 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) IN RE: CROP INPUTS ANTITRUST LITIGATION MDL No. 2993 - ORDER REASSIGNING LITIGATION - The Panel has been notified of the need to reassign the above litigation to another judge in the Eastern District of Missouri. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, with the consent of that court, this litigation is reassigned to the Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Judge, Karen K. CaldwellChair of the Panel. Associated Cases: 4:21-md-02993-SRC et al.(DLB) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DJO) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketJudge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (CLO) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00158. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DJO) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT. Case transferred to Eastern District of Missouri in regard to MDL #2993/ Crop Inputs Antitrust Litigation. (clt) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference held on 05/06/2021, before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe, Telephone number 618-482-9226. NOTICE: Attorneys and unrepresented parties have 7 calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If redactions are not requested, the transcript will be made remotely available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. See the full Transcript Policy on the website at #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms/TransPolicy.pdf Transcript may be viewed at the public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (skr) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) ORDER STAYING CASE: All proceedings and deadlines in the above-captioned cases are STAYED until 14 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer these actions to an MDL proceeding and completes any transfer of the action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/17/2021. (mlp) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Motion Hearing held via video teleconferenceon 5/13/2021 re #41 Motion to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Counsel speaking on behalf of plaintiff were Jamie Boyer, Victoria Sims, and Connor Lemire. Counsel speaking on behalf of defendants were Sharon Rosenberg and Erick VanDorn. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe.) (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) NOTICE of Appearance by Barack S. Echols on behalf of Federated Co-Operatives Ltd. (Echols, Barack) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docket(#103) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/6/2021. Counsel speaking on behalf of plaintiff were Don Barrett, Jamie Boyer, and Derek Brands. Counsel speaking on behalf of defendants were Adam Hemlock and Christopher Hohn. Court discussed deadline for pending motions to dismiss and whether to proceed with initial disclosures, ESI protocol, and protective order. Issues taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe.) (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Plaintiffs in three related actions against the same Defendants, Piper v. Bayer CropScience LP, et al., Case No. 21-cv-21-NJR, Swanson v. Bayer CropScience LP, et al., Case No. 21-cv-46-NJR, and Lex v. Bayer CropScience LP, et al., Case No. 21-cv-122-NJR, seek consolidation of those cases and any subsequently filed related cases. They further seek the appointment of a four-firm Executive Committee as interim lead Plaintiffs' counsel (see Case No. 21-cv-21, Doc. 53). Because this action involves a common question of law or fact, the Court is considering consolidation of this case with the above-referenced actions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). If the parties have any objection to consolidation or to the appointment of an Executive Committee, they shall inform the Court, in writing, on or before March 3, 2021. (Action due by 3/3/2021.) Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/17/2021. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned Chief District Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#8) Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. (lmb) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This matter is before the Court sua sponte for case management purposes. This case is related to another case presently before Chief Judge Rosenstengel (See SDIL case number 21-cv-00021-NJR) The Seventh Circuit has emphasized that related cases filed within the same court should be transferred to (or consolidated before) a single judge in order to promote judicial economy and efficiency and avoid the unnecessary duplication of efforts. See, e.g. Smith v. Check-N-Go of Illinois, Inc., 200 F.3d 511, 513 n.1 (7th Cir. 1999); Blair v. Equifax Check Services, Inc., 181 F.3d 832, 839 (7th Cir. 1999). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to REASSIGN this case to Chief Judge Rosenstengel. All future documents filed in this matter shall bear the case number 21-cv-00158-NJR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 2/12/2021. (spl)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Brandt, Derek) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Darren Duncan. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-158-MAB. Consent due by 3/5/2021 (kls3) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Connor P. Lemire on behalf of Darren Duncan (Lemire, Connor) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Leigh M. Perica on behalf of Darren Duncan (Perica, Leigh) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Y. Brandt on behalf of Darren Duncan (Brandt, Derek) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4400749.), filed by Darren Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons)(Brandt, Derek) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tenkoz Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federated Co-operatives Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where GROWMARK, Inc. is a litigant