This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2021 at 12:15:11 (UTC).

Dunbar v. Encompass Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 Dunbar filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Encompass Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03485

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUSAN DUNBAR

Defendant

Encompass Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason William Jordan

Attorney at Jordan Herington & Rowley

5445 Dtc Parkway, Suite 1000

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Michael S. Douglass-Harris

Attorney at Jordan Herington & Rowley

5445 Dtc Parkway, Suite 1000

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Defendant Attorneys

Winslow Russell Taylor, III

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Kurt Hans Henkel

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #18 Scheduling Order Section 5 by Plaintiff Susan Dunbar. (Douglass-Harris, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#20

(#20) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/12/21. KLM Civil Trial Practice Standards. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#19

(#19) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/12/21. KLM Civil Motions Practice Standards. (nmarb, ) (Main Document 19 replaced on 1/14/2021) (nmarb, ). Modified on 1/14/2021 to replace with correct document. (nmarb, ). (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/12/21. (lgale, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

17 #1

Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice

#17

(#17) MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/12/2021. Discovery due by 10/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2021. Final Pretrial, Trial Preparation and Jury Instructions Conference set for 8/31/2022 9:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Five Day Jury Trial set for 9/26/2022 9:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#15

(#15) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/7/21 GRANTING #11 parties' Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order. The Protective Order [#11-2] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order.(nmarb, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

11 #2

Proposed Document Protective Order

11 #1

Appendix A

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Winslow Russell Taylor, III on behalf of Encompass Indemnity CompanyAttorney Winslow Russell Taylor, III added to party Encompass Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Encompass Indemnity Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2020CV033583. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7604413), filed by Encompass Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #18 Scheduling Order Section 5 by Plaintiff Susan Dunbar. (Douglass-Harris, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/12/21. KLM Civil Trial Practice Standards. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/12/21. KLM Civil Motions Practice Standards. (nmarb, ) (Main Document 19 replaced on 1/14/2021) (nmarb, ). Modified on 1/14/2021 to replace with correct document. (nmarb, ). (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/12/21. (lgale, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/12/2021. Discovery due by 10/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2021. Final Pretrial, Trial Preparation and Jury Instructions Conference set for 8/31/2022 9:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Five Day Jury Trial set for 9/26/2022 9:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/7/21 GRANTING #11 parties' Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order. The Protective Order [#11-2] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order.(nmarb, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/6/21. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #12 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/06/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, ALL COUNSEL OR PARTIES who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference set January 12, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. shall do so by TELEPHONE. Participating counsel or parties shall call the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on January 5, 2021. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Encompass Indemnity Company All parties consent.. (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Encompass Indemnity Company. (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/11/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/5/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 1/12/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Encompass Indemnity Company.(Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Encompass Indemnity Company, filed by Susan Dunbar.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael S. Douglass-Harris on behalf of SUSAN DUNBARAttorney Michael S. Douglass-Harris added to party SUSAN DUNBAR(pty:pla) (Douglass-Harris, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason William Jordan on behalf of SUSAN DUNBARAttorney Jason William Jordan added to party SUSAN DUNBAR(pty:pla) (Jordan, Jason) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Winslow Russell Taylor, III on behalf of Encompass Indemnity CompanyAttorney Winslow Russell Taylor, III added to party Encompass Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Encompass Indemnity Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2020CV033583. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7604413), filed by Encompass Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Winslow Russell Taylor, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt Hans Henkel