This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:29:19 (UTC).

Dunbar v. Airbnb, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Dunbar filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Airbnb, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00648

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT

Referral Judge

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John P. Dunbar

Haiku, HI 96708

Defendant

Airbnb, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Shanlyn A.S. Park

Attorney at McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon

Five Waterfront Plaza 4Th Floor, 500 Ala Moana Blvd

Honolulu, HI 96813

David J. Minkin

Attorney at McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon

Five Waterfront Plaza 4Th Floor, 500 Ala Moana Blvd, 529-7300

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Certificate of Service

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Minkin on behalf of Airbnb, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#6

(#6) EO: On January 14, 2020, Defendant Airbnb, Inc. filed a Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. ECF No. #4 . Defendant's Motion will be heard on March 2, 2020, at 10 a.m. Plaintiff shall file an Opposition memorandum by February 10, 2020. Defendant's Reply is due by February 17, 2020. Motion Hearing is set for 03/02/2020 at 10:00 AM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Airbnb, Inc. (Park, Shanlyn) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

4 #12

Certificate of Service

4 #11

Exhibit 8

4 #10

Exhibit 7

4 #9

Declaration of Shanlyn A.S. Park

4 #8

Exhibit 6

4 #7

Exhibit 5

4 #6

Exhibit 4

4 #5

Exhibit 3

4 #4

Exhibit 2

4 #3

Exhibit 1

4 #2

Declaration of Kyle Miller

4 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion

#4

(#4) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation Shanlyn A.S. Park appearing for Defendant Airbnb, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Kyle Miller, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Declaration of Shanlyn A.S. Park, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Certificate of Service)(Park, Shanlyn) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

3 #1

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EO: Based on the 3/02/2020 hearing date on ECF #4 DEFENDANT AIRBNB, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/03/2020 is CONTINUED to 5/05/2020 at 09:15AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Minkin on behalf of Airbnb, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EO: On January 14, 2020, Defendant Airbnb, Inc. filed a Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. ECF No. #4 . Defendant's Motion will be heard on March 2, 2020, at 10 a.m. Plaintiff shall file an Opposition memorandum by February 10, 2020. Defendant's Reply is due by February 17, 2020. Motion Hearing is set for 03/02/2020 at 10:00 AM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Airbnb, Inc. (Park, Shanlyn) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation Shanlyn A.S. Park appearing for Defendant Airbnb, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Kyle Miller, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Declaration of Shanlyn A.S. Park, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Certificate of Service)(Park, Shanlyn) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 2/3/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; SUMMONS against Airbnb, Inc. - filed by John P. Dunbar A Summons (as indicated in the caption) was not received in this mailing (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt for Filing Fee: HI027811, #3 Mailing Envelope) (jo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.