This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2022 at 06:20:02 (UTC).

Dumas et al v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 Dumas filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Jeffery S. Frensley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00479

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Susan Dumas

Sidney Dumas

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randall L. Kinnard

Attorney at Kinnard Law

127 Woodmont Boulevard

Nashville, TN 37205

W. Patrick Thurman

Attorney at Law Offices of Woods & Woods

1904 Natchez Trace

Nashville, TN 37212

Defendant Attorney

Thomas W. Tucker, III

Attorney at Law Office of Thomas W. Tucker III

1345 Tilton Drive

Franklin, TN 37067

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court filings

1 #2

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation. (mg) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Target Corporation.(Tucker, Thomas) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/18/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Randall L. Kinnard, W. Patrick Thurman, and Thomas W. Tucker, III admitted to this court. (mg) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/18/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Target Corporation.(Tucker, Thomas) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation. (mg) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Circuit Court of Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 22C1016. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNMDC-3618354) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court filings, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) Modified on 6/27/2022 (mg). (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Tucker, III