This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:35:25 (UTC).

Dulany v. Ability Recovery Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Dulany filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Ability Recovery Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00589

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Dulany

Defendant

Ability Recovery Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel J. Ciment

Attorney at Ciment Law Firm, PLLC

24275 Katy Freeway, Suite 400

Katy, TX 77494

Defendant Attorney

Whitney L. White

Attorney at Sessions Fishman Nathan and Isreal LLC

900 Jackson St., Ste 440

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ability Recovery Services, LLC.(White, Whitney) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ROBERT DULANY. (Ciment, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Parties by Ability Recovery Services, LLC. (White, Whitney) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ability Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Whitney) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Whitney L. White on behalf of Ability Recovery Services, LLC . Attorney Whitney L. White added to party Ability Recovery Services, LLC (pty:dft) (White, Whitney) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by ROBERT DULANY. (Ciment, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12204138), filed by ROBERT DULANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Ciment, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Dulany. Ability Recovery Services, LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Ciment, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Ability Recovery Services, LLC. (lt) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ability Recovery Services, LLC.(White, Whitney) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Reset Deadlines: Ability Recovery Services, LLC answer due 7/17/2019. (lt) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or to otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and includes July 17, 2019.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interested Parties by Ability Recovery Services, LLC. (White, Whitney) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ability Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Whitney) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Whitney L. White on behalf of Ability Recovery Services, LLC . Attorney Whitney L. White added to party Ability Recovery Services, LLC (pty:dft) (White, Whitney) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Dulany. Ability Recovery Services, LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Ciment, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Ability Recovery Services, LLC. (lt) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROBERT DULANY. (lt) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lt) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by ROBERT DULANY. (Ciment, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ROBERT DULANY. (Ciment, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12204138), filed by ROBERT DULANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Ciment, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.